Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0098200 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0098200



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 614
16.11.1993 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
15.11.1993 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
15.11.1993 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
15.11.1993 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
15.11.1993 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
09.08.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
04.08.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
07.07.1993 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
07.07.1993 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
07.07.1993 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
07.07.1993 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
05.07.1993 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 1
05.07.1993 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 39
05.07.1993 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
05.07.1993 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
05.07.1993 Title page: Decision (inter partes / revocation of patent) Appeal 29
24.05.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.05.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.05.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.05.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
15.05.1993 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
15.05.1993 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.05.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
14.05.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
14.05.1993 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.05.1993 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
11.05.1993 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
07.05.1993 Communication (no form) Appeal 23
07.05.1993 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
07.05.1993 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
07.05.1993 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
07.05.1993 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
26.04.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
22.04.1993 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
22.04.1993 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
22.04.1993 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
22.04.1993 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
16.03.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.03.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.03.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.03.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
04.02.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.02.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.02.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.01.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.01.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.01.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.01.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
23.01.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
20.01.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
17.01.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.01.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.01.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.01.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
11.01.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
20.09.1991 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
20.09.1991 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
20.09.1991 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
11.09.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 22
11.09.1991 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
16.08.1991 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
16.08.1991 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
16.08.1991 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
16.08.1991 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
16.08.1991 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
23.07.1991 Communication about missing advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.07.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
08.07.1991 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
08.07.1991 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
31.05.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.05.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.05.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.05.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.05.1991 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
15.05.1991 Annex to a communication Opposition 11
15.05.1991 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
15.05.1991 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
15.05.1991 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
15.05.1991 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
15.05.1991 Means of redress Opposition 1
26.04.1991 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
12.12.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.12.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.12.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.11.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 12
26.11.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
26.11.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
26.11.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
26.11.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.09.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.09.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.09.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.09.1990 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Opposition 1
18.09.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.09.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.09.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.09.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.09.1990 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
30.08.1990 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 3
27.08.1990 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 2
23.07.1990 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
23.07.1990 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
23.07.1990 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
13.07.1990 Description Opposition 1
13.07.1990 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 11
29.03.1990 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
29.03.1990 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
29.03.1990 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
29.03.1990 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
08.03.1990 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
05.03.1990 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
05.03.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.03.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 2
27.02.1990 Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied Opposition 1
27.02.1990 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
22.02.1990 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
22.02.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.02.1990 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
20.02.1990 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
20.02.1990 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
20.02.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.02.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.02.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
19.02.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
13.02.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.02.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
09.02.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
07.02.1990 Annex to a communication Opposition 12
07.02.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
07.02.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
08.11.1989 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
24.10.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 50
24.10.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
24.10.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 3
31.05.1989 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
07.04.1989 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
02.02.1989 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
02.02.1989 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
02.02.1989 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
18.11.1988 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
10.11.1988 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
25.07.1988 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
25.07.1988 Text intended for grant Search / examination 20
30.06.1988 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
06.05.1988 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
04.05.1988 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
05.04.1988 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
05.04.1988 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
23.02.1988 Annex Search / examination 6
23.02.1988 Annex Search / examination 14
23.02.1988 Annex Search / examination 9
23.02.1988 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 3
23.02.1988 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 30
11.05.1987 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
20.01.1987 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
24.07.1986 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
12.05.1986 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
05.03.1986 Annex Search / examination 3
05.03.1986 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
12.02.1986 Annex Search / examination 3
12.02.1986 Communication concerning signing of documents Search / examination 1
05.02.1986 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
09.10.1985 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
18.01.1984 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
21.11.1983 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
13.10.1983 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
13.10.1983 Priority document Search / examination 11
29.09.1983 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
29.09.1983 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.09.1983 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
29.09.1983 European search report Search / examination 1
16.06.1983 Abstract Search / examination 1
16.06.1983 Claims Search / examination 3
16.06.1983 Description Search / examination 13
16.06.1983 Drawings Search / examination 2
16.06.1983 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
16.06.1983 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 9
16.06.1983 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10
14.06.1983 Invitation to file authorisation Search / examination 1