Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0103532

EP0103532 - Cylinder lock [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  09.01.1991
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kofman, Anatoly
Tamar 8 Apartment 15
Neve Monson / IL
[1984/12]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1984/12]
Representative(s)Weydert, Robert , et al
Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502
1015 Luxembourg / LU
[N/P]
Former [1984/12]Weydert, Robert , et al
Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502
L-1015 Luxembourg / LU
Application number, filing date83630145.709.09.1983
[1984/12]
Priority number, dateIL1966000066710.09.1982         Original published format: IL 66766
[1984/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0103532
Date:21.03.1984
Language:EN
[1984/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0103532
Date:01.08.1984
Language:EN
[1984/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0103532
Date:24.02.1988
Language:EN
[1988/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.05.1984
ClassificationInternational:E05B27/00, E05B29/10, E05B31/00
[1984/30]
Former International [1984/12]E05B27/00
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   GB,   IT,   LI [1984/12]
TitleGerman:Zylinderschloss[1984/12]
English:Cylinder lock[1984/12]
French:Serrure cylindrique[1984/12]
Examination procedure22.01.1985Examination requested  [1985/15]
31.01.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.05.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.01.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.1987Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
19.08.1987Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.11.1987Fee for grant paid
09.11.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.11.1988  07.01.1989  ADMISSIBLE
R. Berchtold AG
Lätternweg 30
CH-3052 Zollikofen / CH
Opponent's representative
Bruderer, Werner
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Oberhittnauerstrasse 12
8330 Pfäffikon / CH
 [N/P]
Former [1989/03]
Opponent(s)01  23.11.1988  07.01.1989  ADMISSIBLE
R. Berchtold AG
Lätternweg 30
CH-3052 Zollikofen / CH
Opponent's representative
Bruderer, Werner
Patentanwaltskanzlei Oberhittnauerstrasse 12
CH-8330 Pfäffikon / CH
07.08.1989Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.01.1990Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.01.1990Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
22.03.1990Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
12.09.1990Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
22.09.1990Legal effect of revocation of patent [1991/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.08.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
23.08.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
22.09.1987Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2015/21]
Former [1991/42]CH24.02.1988
LI24.02.1988
Documents cited:Search[X]US3035433  (TESTA FRANK J);
 [X]FR2499140  (LORI CORP [US]);
 [A]FR2079573  (VACHETTE SA);
 [A]DE875621  (LITTMAN DAVID)