blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0112279

EP0112279 - Method and device for the batch metering of fluent granular material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.08.1986
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schweizerische Aluminium AG
CH-3965 Chippis / CH
[N/P]
Former [1984/26]For all designated states
SCHWEIZERISCHE ALUMINIUM AG
CH-3965 Chippis / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Jaggi, Ernst
N-5450 Sunde / NO
[1984/26]
Application number, filing date83810488.321.10.1983
[1984/26]
Priority number, dateCH1982000669417.11.1982         Original published format: CH 669482
[1984/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0112279
Date:27.06.1984
Language:DE
[1984/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0112279
Date:05.09.1984
Language:DE
[1984/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.07.1984
ClassificationIPC:C25C3/14, G01F11/28, B65G53/14, C21B5/00
[1984/26]
CPC:
B65D90/54 (EP); C25C3/14 (EP); G01F11/28 (EP);
Y02P10/134 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1984/26]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur portionenweisen Dosierung eines fluidisierbaren Schüttgutes und Verfahren zu deren Betrieb[1984/26]
English:Method and device for the batch metering of fluent granular material[1984/26]
French:Dispositif et procédé pour le prélèvement des quantités dosées de matière solide en vrac[1984/26]
File destroyed:10.12.1992
Examination procedure22.02.1985Examination requested  [1985/18]
21.11.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.03.1986Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1986/41]
02.05.1986Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1986/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.09.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]GB685365  (STANDARD OIL DEV CO);
 [A]DE1130754  (SIEMENS AG);
 [A]DE1151676  (WOLFGANG BARTSCH DIPL ING DR I);
 [A]US3380780  (ALLEN KENNETH M, et al);
 [A]DE1949173  (NAT RES DEV);
 [A]US4002372  (EDWARDS JOSEPH FRANKLIN, et al);
 [A]DE2914238  (ALUSUISSE);
 [E]EP0069057  (ALUSUISSE [CH])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.