Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0126128 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0126128



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 308
05.03.1993 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
04.03.1993 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
04.03.1993 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
26.08.1992 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 14
02.03.1992 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
25.09.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.09.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.09.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 11
23.08.1991 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
23.08.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.08.1991 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
02.08.1991 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
28.03.1991 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
27.03.1991 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
20.03.1991 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 16
18.03.1991 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 16
28.02.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.02.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
06.02.1991 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
04.02.1991 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
29.01.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
31.12.1990 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
16.11.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.11.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.11.1990 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
12.11.1990 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
12.11.1990 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 7
12.11.1990 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 1
12.11.1990 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 1
25.09.1990 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
21.09.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.09.1990 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.09.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.09.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.09.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
14.09.1990 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
14.09.1990 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.09.1990 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
14.09.1990 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
10.09.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
07.09.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
04.09.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
03.09.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
29.08.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
27.08.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
06.08.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.07.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
27.07.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
05.06.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
02.06.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
31.05.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
25.04.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.04.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
08.01.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.12.1989 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 4
16.11.1989 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
07.11.1989 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
06.11.1989 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
12.09.1989 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
05.09.1989 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
04.09.1989 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
27.04.1989 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
27.04.1989 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
02.04.1989 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
06.03.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.02.1989 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
18.02.1989 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 4
16.01.1989 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
07.01.1989 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
09.11.1988 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
31.10.1988 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
31.10.1988 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
14.07.1988 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
14.07.1988 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
19.04.1988 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
25.03.1988 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
25.03.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.03.1988 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
15.05.1987 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
02.03.1987 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
02.03.1987 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
02.03.1987 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
11.12.1986 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
03.10.1986 Claims Search / examination 1
03.10.1986 Description Search / examination 4
03.10.1986 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
02.09.1986 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
02.09.1986 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
02.09.1986 Text intended for grant Search / examination 17
07.08.1986 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 3
05.05.1986 Claims Search / examination 2
05.05.1986 Description Search / examination 8
05.05.1986 Drawings Search / examination 2
05.05.1986 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.01.1986 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
26.11.1984 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
01.10.1984 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
20.09.1984 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
30.07.1984 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
30.07.1984 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
02.07.1984 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
29.06.1984 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
28.06.1984 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
26.06.1984 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 2
26.06.1984 Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) Search / examination 2
13.06.1984 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
07.06.1984 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
07.06.1984 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 28
07.06.1984 Priority document Search / examination 24
23.12.1983 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
20.12.1983 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1