Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0126128
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR8307616 02.10.1984A
Priority number Date
GB8300288 14.11.1983
GB8233014 19.11.1982
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE3372189D 30.07.1987D1
Priority number Date
GB8300288 14.11.1983
GB8233014 19.11.1982
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US4720918 26.01.1988A
Priority number Date
GB8300288 14.11.1983
GB8233014 19.11.1982
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO8402104Global Dossier 07.06.1984A1
Priority number Date
GB8233014 19.11.1982
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0126128Global Dossier 24.06.1987B1
EP0126128 28.11.1984A1
Priority number Date
GB8233014 19.11.1982
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA1229476 24.11.1987A
Priority number Date
GB8233014 19.11.1982
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES275817Y 16.12.1984Y
ES275817U 16.05.1984U
Priority number Date
GB8233014 19.11.1982
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB2130955 02.10.1985B
GB2130955 13.06.1984A
GB8330432D 21.12.1983D0
Priority number Date
GB8233014 19.11.1982
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
IN160884 15.08.1987B
Priority number Date
GB8233014 19.11.1982
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JPH0532076B 14.05.1993B2
JPS59502135 27.12.1984A
Priority number Date
GB8233014 19.11.1982
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
MX161634 27.11.1990A
Priority number Date
GB8233014 19.11.1982