Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0126128

Designated contracting states CHLapse: 30.11.1989
 DE 
FR 
 LILapse: 30.11.1989
 NL 
Examination procedure24.02.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase03.07.1984National basic fee paid 
03.07.1984Designation fee(s) paid 
14.11.1984Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
06.10.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
European patent granted24.06.1987
Opposition procedure14.03.1993Legal effect of rejection of opposition published on 28.04.1993 
Appeal following opposition31.12.1990APPEAL FILED
18.03.1991APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
26.08.1992APPEAL RESULT
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:28.11.1984 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Designated State(s):CH DE FR LI NL
 
Event date:30.01.1985 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19841114
 
Event date:08.05.1985 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:CURRY, FRANCIS, RUSSELL
 
Event date:08.05.1985 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:GLASSON, EDWIN, LLOYD
 
Event date:08.05.1985 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:PUMFREY, JOAN
 
Event date:08.05.1985 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:KOZLOWSKI, ROMUALD
 
Event date:24.06.1987 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):CH DE FR LI NL
 
Event date:30.07.1987 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:3372189
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:19870730
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:31.07.1987 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:01.06.1988 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
OPPONENT:WILKINSON SWORD GMBH
Effective DATE:19880317
 
Event date:01.08.1988 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
OPPONENT:WILKINSON SWORD GMBH
 
Event date:30.11.1989 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Effective DATE:19891130
 
Event date:30.11.1989 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Effective DATE:19891130
 
Event date:31.07.1990 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:28.04.1993 
Event description:OPPOSITION REJECTED
Effective DATE:19930304
 
Event date:05.05.1993 
Event description:OPPOSITION REJECTED (CORRECTED)
Free Format Text:930314
 
Event date:16.06.1993 
Event description:NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION
 
Event date:19.10.1999 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:19991019
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:20.10.1999 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:19991020
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:27.10.1999 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:19991027
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:01.06.2001 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20010601
 
Event date:31.07.2001 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20010731
 
Event date:01.08.2001 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20010801
 
Event date:01.08.2001 
Event description:NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
Effective DATE:20010601
 
Event date:07.09.2001 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE