Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0126128

EP0126128 - RAZOR BLADES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  16.03.1993
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Gillette Company
Prudential Tower Building
Boston, Massachusetts 02190 / US
[1984/48]
Inventor(s)01 / CURRY, Francis, Russell
3 Carlisle Gardens
Twyford, Berkshire / GB
02 / GLASSON, Edwin, Lloyd
35 Emmets Park Binfield
Bracknell, Berkshire / GB
03 / PUMFREY, Joan
Hearns House Gallowstree Common
Reading, Berkshire / GB
04 / KOZLOWSKI, Romuald
deceased / GB
[1985/19]
Former [1984/48]01 / CURRY, Francis, Russell
3 Carlisle Gardens
Twyford, Berkshire / GB
02 / GLASSON, Edwin, Lloyd
35 Emmets Park Binfield
Bracknell, Berkshire / GB
03 / PUMFREY, Joan
Hearns House Gallowstree Common
Reading, Berkshire / GB
04 / KOZLOWSKI, Romauld
deceased / GB
Representative(s)Simpson, Ronald Duncan Innes , et al
A.A.Thornton & Co. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn
London WCIV 7LE / GB
[1984/48]
Application number, filing date83903805.614.11.1983
[1984/48]
WO1983GB00288
Priority number, dateGB1982003301419.11.1982         Original published format: GB 8233014
[1984/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO8402104
Date:07.06.1984
[1984/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0126128
Date:28.11.1984
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.1984
[1984/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0126128
Date:24.06.1987
Language:EN
[1987/26]
Search report(s)
ClassificationInternational:B26B21/56
[1984/48]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   LI,   NL [1984/48]
TitleGerman:RASIERKLINGEN[1984/48]
English:RAZOR BLADES[1984/48]
French:LAMES DE RASOIR[1984/48]
Entry into regional phase03.07.1984National basic fee paid 
03.07.1984Designation fee(s) paid 
14.11.1984Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.11.1984Examination requested  [1985/05]
08.01.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.05.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.09.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
11.12.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.02.1987Fee for grant paid
24.02.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.03.1988  12.07.1988  ADMISSIBLE
Wilkinson Sword GmbH
Schützenstrasse 110
D-5650 Solingen 1 / DE
Opponent's representative
Rausch Wanischeck-Bergmann Brinkmann
Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte
Am Seestern 8
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1988/22]
Opponent(s)01  17.03.1988  12.07.1988  ADMISSIBLE
Wilkinson Sword GmbH
Schützenstrasse 110
D-5650 Solingen 1 / DE
Opponent's representative
Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte
Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70
D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE
14.07.1988Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
31.10.1988Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.11.1988Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
18.02.1989Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
27.04.1989Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M08)
22.12.1989Reply to a communication from the opposition division
04.10.1990Date of oral proceedings
12.11.1990Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.08.1992Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
04.03.1993Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1993/17]
14.03.1993Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1993/18]
Appeal following opposition31.12.1990Appeal received No.  T0017/91
18.03.1991Statement of grounds filed
26.08.1992Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in unamended form
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
06.10.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH30.11.1989
LI30.11.1989
[1990/46]
Cited inInternational search[A]FR2234100  ;
 [A]US3811189  ;
 [A]GB1258348