blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0124800

EP0124800 - Epoxy resin laminate for a printed-circuit board [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition procedure closed
Status updated on  19.01.1996
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HÜLS TROISDORF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Postfach 11 65
D-53839 Troisdorf / DE
[1984/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Spielau, Paul, Dr.
Van-Gogh-Platz 10
D-5210 Troisdorf-Eschmar / DE
02 / Fassbender, Helmut, Dr.
Leuchter Gemark 17
D-5060 Bergisch-Gladbach 2 / DE
03 / Weiss, Richard, Dr.
Stresemannstrasse 16
D-5210 Troisdorf / DE
[1984/46]
Application number, filing date84104209.613.04.1984
[1984/46]
Priority number, dateDE1983331636205.05.1983         Original published format: DE 3316362
[1984/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0124800
Date:14.11.1984
Language:DE
[1984/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0124800
Date:13.05.1987
Language:DE
[1987/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0124800
Date:18.07.1990
Language:DE
[1990/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.1987
ClassificationIPC:H05K1/03
[1984/46]
CPC:
B32B5/28 (EP,US); B32B15/14 (US); B32B15/20 (US);
B32B5/26 (US); H05K1/036 (EP,US); H05K1/0366 (EP,US);
B32B2260/021 (US); B32B2260/046 (US); B32B2262/101 (US);
B32B2457/08 (US); H05K1/024 (EP,US); H05K2201/0129 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0145 (EP,US); H05K2201/0278 (EP,US); Y10S428/901 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31511 (EP,US); Y10T428/31518 (EP,US); Y10T428/31522 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31525 (EP,US); Y10T428/31529 (EP,US); Y10T442/3423 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3431 (EP,US); Y10T442/3439 (EP,US); Y10T442/3512 (EP,US);
Y10T442/352 (EP,US); Y10T442/656 (EP,US); Y10T442/669 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1984/46]
TitleGerman:Schichtpressstoff auf Epoxydharzbasis für gedruckte Schaltungen[1984/46]
English:Epoxy resin laminate for a printed-circuit board[1984/46]
French:Laminé à base de résine époxy pour circuit imprimé[1984/46]
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure12.09.1987Examination requested  [1987/45]
11.07.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.01.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.01.1990Fee for grant paid
20.01.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.04.1991  06.05.1991  ADMISSIBLE
ISOLA WERKE AG
Isolastrasse 2
D-52353 Düren / DE
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Strasse 4
80335 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1991/23]
Opponent(s)01  09.04.1991  06.05.1991  ADMISSIBLE
ISOLA WERKE AG
Isolastrasse 2
D-52353 Düren / DE
Opponent's representative
TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
D-81679 München / DE
28.05.1991Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.10.1995Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed
19.10.1995Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1996/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.04.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
04.04.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
09.04.1988Renewal fee patent year 05
08.04.1989Renewal fee patent year 06
16.03.1990Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.04.1991
GB13.04.1991
SE14.04.1991
BE30.04.1991
CH30.04.1991
LI30.04.1991
LU30.04.1991
NL01.11.1991
FR30.12.1991
DE01.02.1992
[2015/21]
Former [1995/23]AT13.04.1991
GB13.04.1991
SE14.04.1991
BE30.04.1991
CH30.04.1991
IT30.04.1991
LI30.04.1991
LU30.04.1991
NL01.11.1991
FR30.12.1991
DE01.02.1992
Former [1995/15]AT13.04.1991
GB13.04.1991
SE14.04.1991
BE30.04.1991
CH30.04.1991
LI30.04.1991
LU30.04.1991
NL01.11.1991
FR30.12.1991
DE01.02.1992
Former [1992/46]AT13.04.1991
GB13.04.1991
SE14.04.1991
BE30.04.1991
CH30.04.1991
LI30.04.1991
NL01.11.1991
FR30.12.1991
DE01.02.1992
Former [1992/34]GB13.04.1991
SE14.04.1991
BE30.04.1991
CH30.04.1991
LI30.04.1991
NL01.11.1991
FR30.12.1991
DE01.02.1992
Former [1992/33]GB13.04.1991
SE14.04.1991
BE30.04.1991
CH30.04.1991
LI30.04.1991
NL01.11.1991
DE01.02.1992
Former [1992/32]GB13.04.1991
SE14.04.1991
BE30.04.1991
CH30.04.1991
LI30.04.1991
NL01.11.1991
Former [1992/16]GB13.04.1991
SE14.04.1991
CH30.04.1991
LI30.04.1991
NL01.11.1991
Former [1992/12]SE14.04.1991
CH30.04.1991
LI30.04.1991
NL01.11.1991
Former [1992/09]SE14.04.1991
CH30.04.1991
LI30.04.1991
Former [1992/03]SE14.04.1991
Documents cited:Search[A]DE1694281  (GEN ELECTRIC);
 [A]US3940534  (FICK HERBERT J, et al);
 [A]US3987230  (GAKU MORIO, et al);
 [A]US4327143  (ALVINO WILLIAM M, et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.