Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP0126292

Designated contracting states DE 
FR 
GB 
 IT 
Examination procedure12.08.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.04.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
15.04.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
European patent granted02.12.1987
Opposition procedure03.09.1988No opposition filed within time limit published on 09.11.1988 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:22.01.1988 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:17.11.1988 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
 
Event date:30.04.1991 
Event description:IT: LAST PAID ANNUAL FEE
 
Event date:28.11.1984 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:02.12.1987 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:28.11.1984 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19840416
 
Event date:17.12.1987 
Event description:IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED
 
Event date:14.01.1988 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:3467953
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:19880114
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:09.12.1998 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:19980416
 
Event date:05.02.1999 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
 
Event date:02.02.1999 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:19990202
 
Event date:30.04.1998 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY
Effective DATE:19980430
 
Event date:16.04.1998 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:19980416
 
Event date:28.04.1997 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:19970428
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:09.04.1997 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:19970409
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:07.04.1997 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:19970407
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:17.10.1987 
Event description:(EXPECTED) GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210
 
Event date:28.09.1984 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:29.09.1988 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
 
Event date:29.09.1988 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261