Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0134890

EP0134890 - Device for the preparation of high quality solid-liquid mixtures up to the colloid system or up to coagulation for the treatment of water or to introduce gases into liquids [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.07.1991
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.1991No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.09.1991 [1991/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hacheney, Wilfried
Am Königsberg 15
D-4930 Detmold / DE
[1985/13]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1985/13]
Representative(s)Stracke, Alexander , et al
Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [1985/13]Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Loesenbeck Dipl.-Ing. Stracke Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 Postfach 10 18 82
D-33518 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date84104960.403.05.1984
[1985/13]
Priority number, dateDE1983332595219.07.1983         Original published format: DE 3325952
[1985/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0134890
Date:27.03.1985
Language:DE
[1985/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0134890
Date:16.06.1987
Language:DE
[1987/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0134890
Date:12.09.1990
Language:DE
[1990/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP28.04.1987
ClassificationInternational:B01F3/12, B01F7/22, C02F3/20
[1987/24]
Former International [1985/13]B01F3/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1985/13]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Herstellen hochwertiger Feststoff-Flüssigkeits-Gemische bis zum kolloiden System oder bis zur Koagulation, zur Wasseraufbereitung oder zum Einbringen von Gasen in Flüssigkeiten[1985/13]
English:Device for the preparation of high quality solid-liquid mixtures up to the colloid system or up to coagulation for the treatment of water or to introduce gases into liquids[1985/13]
French:Dispositif de préparation de mélange solide-liquide à haute teneur jusqu'au système colloidal ou jusqu'à la coagulation pour l'épuration de l'eau ou pour l'introduction de gaz dans des liquides[1985/13]
Examination procedure05.10.1987Examination requested  [1987/49]
28.12.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.06.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.11.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.04.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.08.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.12.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.02.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.03.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.06.1990Fee for grant paid
15.06.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.06.1991No opposition filed within time limit [1991/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
01.04.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
27.04.1988Renewal fee patent year 05
05.05.1989Renewal fee patent year 06
04.05.1990Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[E]DE3241011  (HACHENEY WILFRIED);
 [X]DE1179913  (FORSCHUNGSGESELLSCHAFT DER IAW);
 [X]US4099005  (FULLINGTON MICHAEL C, et al);
 [A]DE2841011  (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG);
 [A]DE2730190  (BUCHER GUYER AG MASCH)