blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0124887

EP0124887 - Device for preparing and supplying cleaning and disinfecting liquids to dental suction appliances [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.02.1990
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DÜRR-DENTAL GMBH & CO. KG
Höpfigheimer Strasse 17
D-74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1984/46]For all designated states
Dürr-Dental GmbH & Co. KG
Höpfigheimer Strasse 17
D-74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hofman, Hans-Joachim
August-Lämmle-Strasse 26
D-7064 Remshalden 3 / DE
02 / Bollmann, Andreas
Holderstrasse 12
D-7140 Ludwigsburg-Ossweil / DE
[1984/46]
Representative(s)Utermann, Gerd
Kilianstrasse 7 (Kilianspassage)
74072 Heilbronn / DE
[N/P]
Former [1984/46]Utermann, Gerd, Dipl.-Ing.
Kilianstrasse 7 (Kilianspassage)
D-74072 Heilbronn / DE
Application number, filing date84105018.004.05.1984
[1984/46]
Priority number, dateDE1983331674107.05.1983         Original published format: DE 3316741
[1984/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0124887
Date:14.11.1984
Language:DE
[1984/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0124887
Date:19.03.1986
Language:DE
[1986/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.1986
ClassificationIPC:A61C17/04
[1984/46]
CPC:
A61C1/0076 (EP,US); A61C17/135 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1984/46]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Bereitstellung, ggf. Mischung mit Wasser und Zuführung von Reinigungs- und Desinfektionsflüssigkeit zu zahnärztlichen Sauganlagen[1984/46]
English:Device for preparing and supplying cleaning and disinfecting liquids to dental suction appliances[1984/46]
French:Dispositif de préparation de liquides de rinçage et désinfection dans les installations d'aspiration dentaire[1984/46]
File destroyed:11.06.1996
Examination procedure05.06.1986Examination requested  [1986/34]
21.07.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.12.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10)
18.02.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.10.1989Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1990/15]
06.11.1989Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1990/15]
Request for further processing for:04.12.1987Request for further processing filed
04.12.1987Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.01.1988Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
17.04.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
21.05.1988Renewal fee patent year 05
13.05.1989Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0023036  (SIEMENS AG [DE]);
 [A]FR2351588  (ALFA LAVAL AB [SE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.