blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0125702

EP0125702 - Polycyclic aromatic compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.06.1988
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE WELLCOME FOUNDATION LIMITED
Unicorn House 160 Euston Road P.O. Box 129
London NW1 2BP / GB
[N/P]
Former [1984/47]For all designated states
THE WELLCOME FOUNDATION LIMITED
Unicorn House 160 Euston Road
London NW1 2BP / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Bair, Kenneth Walter
342 Wesley Drive
Chapel Hill North Carolina 27514 / US
[1984/47]
Representative(s)Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Strasse 4
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1985/42]Sandmair, Kurt, Dr. Dr., et al
Patentanwälte Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Postfach 86 02 45
D-81629 München / DE
Former [1984/47]Berg, Wilhelm, Dr.
Patentanwälte Dr. Berg Dipl.-Ing. Stapf Dipl.-Ing. Schwabe Dr. Dr. Sandmair Postfach 86 02 45 Stuntzstrasse 16
D-8000 München 86 / DE
Application number, filing date84105585.816.05.1984
[1984/47]
Priority number, dateGB1983001357117.05.1983         Original published format: GB 8313571
[1984/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0125702
Date:21.11.1984
Language:EN
[1984/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0125702
Date:13.03.1985
Language:EN
[1985/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0125702
Date:12.08.1987
Language:EN
[1987/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.01.1985
ClassificationIPC:C07C91/10, C07C93/04, C07C93/14, C07C91/14, C07C89/00, C07C47/575, A61K31/13, A61K31/645, A61K31/12, C07C119/10, C07C103/78
[1984/47]
CPC:
A61K31/045 (EP,US); C07C215/20 (KR); A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP); C07C205/15 (EP,US); C07C215/10 (EP,US);
C07C215/28 (EP,US); C07C215/42 (EP,US); C07C217/48 (EP,US);
C07C217/58 (EP,US); C07C255/58 (EP,US); C07C317/32 (EP,US);
C07C323/32 (EP,US); C07D231/12 (EP,US); C07D233/56 (EP,US);
C07D249/08 (EP,US); C07D263/52 (EP,US); C07D263/64 (EP,US);
C07D295/135 (EP,US); C07D309/12 (EP,US); C07D319/06 (EP,US);
C07J63/008 (EP,US); C07C2601/14 (EP,US); C07C2603/24 (EP,US);
C07C2603/26 (EP,US); C07C2603/40 (EP,US); C07C2603/42 (EP,US);
C07C2603/48 (EP,US); C07C2603/50 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1984/47]
TitleGerman:Polycyclische aromatische Verbindungen[1984/47]
English:Polycyclic aromatic compounds[1984/47]
French:Composés aromatiques polycycliques[1984/47]
Examination procedure09.05.1985Examination requested  [1985/32]
16.01.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.05.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.09.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
06.02.1987Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.04.1987Fee for grant paid
08.04.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination13.08.1991Appeal received No.  T0946/91
31.10.1991Statement of grounds filed
29.10.1992Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1992/44]
28.12.1992Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1992/53]
17.08.1993Result of appeal procedure: other kind of disposal
17.08.1993Date of oral proceedings
24.08.1993Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Opposition(s)14.05.1988No opposition filed within time limit [1988/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.04.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]SU182132  ;
 [X]CH135932  (IG FARBENINDUSTRIE AG [DE]);
 [X]US2865925  (BOLEN CHESTER H);
 [A]DE2362749  (RICHARDSON MERRELL INC);
 [X]US4211726  (LANG STANLEY A JR [US], et al)
 [AD]  - ARZNEIMITTELFORSCHUNG, DRUG RESEARCH, Vol. 7, 1982, Aulendorf: HRABOWSKA et al.: "Antitumor activity of 1-nitro-9-amino-acridine derivatives", Pages 1013-1016
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 55, No. 4, February 20, 1961, Columbus, Ohio, (USA) L. NEDELEC et al.: "10-Formylanthrone and its tautomeric enolic forms, (hydroxymethylene) anthrone and 9-hydroxy-10-anthraldehyde", column 3534, Abstract no. 3535a; & BULL. SOC. CHIM. France 1960, Pages 1204-16
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 66, No. 11, March 13, 1967, Columbus, Ohio, (USA) D.W. CAMERON et al.: "Some acyl derivatives of 2,6-dimethoxy-anthracene", Page 4379, Abstract no. 46242w; & J. CHEM. SOC., C 1967(1), Pages 99-101
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 70, No. 9, March 3, 1969, Columbus, Ohio, (USA) N.P. BUU-HOI et al.: "Novel synthesis of 6-methylchrysene and 6,12-dimethylchrysene: note on methylcoronene", Page 318, Abstract no. 37532w; & BULL. SOC. CHIM. Fr. 1968, (9), Pages 3808-10
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 73, No. 17, October 26, 1970, Columbus, Ohio, (USA) N. CAMPBELL: "3-Formylfluoranthene and 3,9-diacetylfluoroanthene", Page 337, Abstract no. 67683d; & CHEM. IND. (London) 1970, (34), Pages 1114-15
 [X]  - REGISTRY HANDBOOK, 1974, supplement, Registry Numbers 43 226-08-0 through 51 771-93-4, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, Columbus, Ohio, (USA)
 [X]  - REGISTRY HANDBOOK, 1981, supplement, Registry Numbers 78 198-84-2 through 80 386-99-8, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, Columbus, Ohio, (USA)
 [X]  - BEILSTEINS "Handbuch der organischen Chemie", 4th edition, Vol. 4, 1922, JULIUS SPRINGER, Berlin, Pages 303-304
 [X]  - BEILSTEINS "Handbuch der Organischen Chemie", 4th edition, Vol. 4, supplement 3, 1962, SPRINGER-VERLAG, Berlin, Göttingen, Heidelberg, Pages 850-852
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 98, No. 13, March 28, 1983, Columbus, Ohio, (USA) G. CARDILLO et al.: "A new synthesis of aminodiols end hydroxyaziridines using acetate and carbonate ions on a polymeric support", Page 554, Abstract no. 106748p; & J. CHEM. SOC., CHEM. COMMUN. 1982, (22), Pages 1309-11
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.