Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0131141 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0131141



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 452
15.12.1992 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
10.12.1992 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
10.12.1992 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
15.10.1992 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
15.10.1992 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
05.10.1992 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 20
05.10.1992 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
02.10.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.10.1992 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
02.10.1992 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
01.10.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
30.09.1992 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
30.09.1992 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
29.09.1992 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
29.09.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.09.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
25.09.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
25.09.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
25.09.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
25.09.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
15.09.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.09.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
27.06.1992 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
17.06.1992 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
15.06.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.06.1992 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
15.06.1992 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
15.06.1992 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
10.06.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.06.1992 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
01.06.1992 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
06.04.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.04.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.04.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
06.03.1992 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
06.03.1992 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
04.03.1992 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
24.02.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.02.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
27.01.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.01.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
10.09.1991 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
03.09.1991 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
01.08.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.07.1991 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
25.07.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
18.07.1991 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
18.07.1991 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
08.06.1991 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.06.1991 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.06.1991 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.06.1991 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
08.06.1991 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
08.06.1991 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
08.06.1991 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
08.06.1991 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
08.05.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.05.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
02.05.1991 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
02.05.1991 Claims Opposition 1
02.05.1991 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
02.05.1991 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 8
02.05.1991 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
08.02.1991 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
14.01.1991 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
14.01.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
12.01.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
08.01.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
08.01.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
08.01.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.01.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
28.12.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
28.12.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
28.12.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
28.12.1990 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 18
17.12.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
17.12.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
17.12.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
17.12.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
17.12.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
17.12.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
17.12.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
19.11.1990 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
17.11.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.11.1990 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
16.11.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
13.11.1990 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.11.1990 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
13.11.1990 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
04.10.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.09.1990 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.09.1990 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.09.1990 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.08.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.07.1990 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
29.06.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.06.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
09.04.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.03.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
27.03.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
26.03.1990 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
26.03.1990 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
18.10.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.09.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
13.09.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.09.1989 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 4
18.08.1989 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
07.08.1989 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
19.06.1989 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
10.06.1989 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
21.02.1989 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
13.02.1989 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
13.02.1989 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
09.02.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
09.02.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
09.02.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.02.1989 Authorisation Opposition 1
07.02.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
07.02.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
01.02.1989 Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied Opposition 1
30.01.1989 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
12.01.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
12.01.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
19.04.1988 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
29.02.1988 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
16.01.1988 English translation of the claims Search / examination 1
16.01.1988 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
16.01.1988 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
07.01.1988 English translation of the claims Search / examination 1
07.01.1988 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.10.1987 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
08.10.1987 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
24.09.1987 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
24.09.1987 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
24.09.1987 Text intended for grant Search / examination 8
10.04.1987 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.04.1987 Claims Search / examination 1
10.04.1987 Description Search / examination 5
10.04.1987 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.03.1987 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
20.11.1986 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.11.1986 Claims Search / examination 1
20.11.1986 Description Search / examination 10
20.11.1986 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
22.10.1986 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
30.01.1985 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
21.11.1984 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
15.10.1984 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
15.10.1984 European search report Search / examination 2
28.08.1984 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
28.07.1984 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
19.07.1984 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
14.07.1984 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
14.07.1984 Priority document Search / examination 10
14.07.1984 Priority document Search / examination 15
10.07.1984 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
09.07.1984 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 3
16.06.1984 Drawings Search / examination 3
16.06.1984 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
02.06.1984 Abstract Search / examination 1
02.06.1984 Claims Search / examination 2
02.06.1984 Description Search / examination 10
02.06.1984 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.06.1984 Drawings Search / examination 3
02.06.1984 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10