blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0132689

EP0132689 - Process for the preparation of 1-amino-4-bromo-anthraquinone-2-sulfonic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.08.1987
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.1987No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.10.1987 [1987/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAYER AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1985/07]For all designated states
BAYER AG
D-51368 Leverkusen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schmitz, Reinold, Dr.
Im Kerberich 36
D-5068 Odenthal / DE
02 / Ohm, Josef, Dr.
Tannenweg 16
D-5090 Leverkusen 3 / DE
03 / Schneider, Jürgen, Dr.
Am Thelensiefen 9
D-5068 Odenthal / DE
[1985/07]
Application number, filing date84108047.610.07.1984
[1985/07]
Priority number, dateDE1983332656322.07.1983         Original published format: DE 3326563
[1985/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0132689
Date:13.02.1985
Language:DE
[1985/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0132689
Date:29.10.1986
Language:DE
[1986/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.11.1984
ClassificationIPC:C07C143/665, C07C139/00
[1985/07]
CPC:
C07C303/22 (EP)
C-Set:
C07C303/22, C07C309/53 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [1985/07]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von 1-Amino-4-bromanthrachinon-2-sulfonsäure[1985/07]
English:Process for the preparation of 1-amino-4-bromo-anthraquinone-2-sulfonic acid[1985/07]
French:Procédé de préparation d'acide 1-amino-4-bromoanthraquinone-2-sulfonique[1985/07]
File destroyed:15.01.2000
Examination procedure10.07.1984Examination requested  [1985/07]
03.09.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.12.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
22.04.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.04.1986Fee for grant paid
28.04.1986Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.07.1987No opposition filed within time limit [1987/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.06.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchDE2551767  [ ] (ICI LTD);
 DE2740889  [ ] (BAYER AG);
 DE2740885  [ ] (BAYER AG);
 DE2303746  [ ];
 CH549625  [ ] (SANDOZ AG);
 US2413790  [ ] (SEYMOUR GEORGE W, et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.