Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0136464

EP0136464 - Therapeutic compositions for oral use containing stable S-Adenosy1-L-Methionine salts [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.08.1989
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2009Change - representativepublished on 30.09.2009  [2009/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BIORESEARCH S.p.A.
Località Roggia Pirola I-20060 Liscate
Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1985/15]For all designated states
BIORESEARCH S.p.A.
Località Roggia Pirola
I-20060 Liscate Milano / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Gennari, Federico
Via Leonardo da Vinci 52
Truccazzano Milano / IT
02 / Aspesi, Pier Luigi
Via Cosseria, 4
Milano / IT
[1985/15]
Representative(s)Gervasi, Gemma , et al
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A.
Corso di Porta Vittoria 9
20122 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2009/40]Gervasi, Gemma , et al
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9
20122 Milano / IT
Former [1985/15]Gervasi, Gemma, Dr. , et al
Studio Brevetti e Marchi NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI S.r.l. 33, Viale Bianca Maria
I-20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date84109110.101.08.1984
[1985/15]
Priority number, dateIT1983002262124.08.1983         Original published format: IT 2262183
[1985/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0136464
Date:10.04.1985
Language:EN
[1985/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0136464
Date:03.07.1985
Language:EN
[1985/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0136464
Date:26.10.1988
Language:EN
[1988/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.04.1985
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/70, A61K9/36, A61K9/52
[1985/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1985/15]
TitleGerman:Beständige 5-Adenosyl-L-Methionin-Salze enthaltende, pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen für orale Anwendung[1985/28]
English:Therapeutic compositions for oral use containing stable S-Adenosy1-L-Methionine salts[1985/15]
French:Composition thérapeutiques à usage oral contenant des sels 5-adénosyl-L-méthionine stables[1985/28]
Examination procedure08.11.1985Examination requested  [1986/05]
07.08.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.09.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.1987Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.01.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.02.1988Fee for grant paid
24.02.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.07.1989No opposition filed within time limit [1989/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
07.07.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
01.08.1988Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[YD]US4057686  (FIECCHI ALBERTO);
 [YD]EP0073376  (BIORESEARCH SPA [IT]);
 [Y]DE2745705  (ABBOTT LAB);
 [Y]EP0063014  (SANKYO CO [JP])