Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0144533

EP0144533 - Credit card [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.05.1990
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Blaupunkt-Werke GmbH
Postfach 77 77 77
31132 Hildesheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [1985/25]For all designated states
Blaupunkt-Werke GmbH
Postfach 77 77 77
D-31132 Hildesheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Baum, Wolfgang, Ing.grad.
Plötzenstrasse 102
D-3200 Hildesheim / DE
[1985/25]
Representative(s)Eilers, Norbert
Blaupunkt-Werke GmbH Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 77 77 77
31132 Hildesheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [1985/25]Eilers, Norbert, Dipl.-Phys.
Blaupunkt-Werke GmbH Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 77 77 77
D-31132 Hildesheim / DE
Application number, filing date84109786.816.08.1984
[1985/25]
Priority number, dateDE1983334385603.12.1983         Original published format: DE 3343856
[1985/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0144533
Date:19.06.1985
Language:DE
[1985/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0144533
Date:17.02.1988
Language:DE
[1988/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.12.1987
ClassificationInternational:G06K19/06
[1985/25]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1985/25]
TitleGerman:Kreditkarte[1985/25]
English:Credit card[1985/30]
French:Carte de crédit[1985/30]
File destroyed:11.06.1996
Examination procedure31.05.1988Examination requested  [1988/31]
11.09.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.01.1990Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1990/29]
22.02.1990Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1990/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
17.08.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
04.08.1988Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.198906   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4231458  ;
 [A]FR1287880  ;
 [A]US3702464  ;
 [A]US4104515