Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0139986

EP0139986 - Polyvinyl chloride composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.10.1988
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.1988No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.11.1988 [1988/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VISH CHIMIKO-TECHNOLOGITCHESKI INSTITUT
8 Boul. Kl. Ohridski
Sofia / BG
[1985/19]
Inventor(s)01 / Natov, Miltcho Angelov, Prof.
Quartal Simeonovo Kisseliza Strasse 11
Sofia / BG
02 / Vassileva, Stefanka Vassileva
Komplex Mladost Block 14-2
Sofia / BG
03 / Kotchev, Hristo Borissov, Dipl.-Ing.
Shipka Strasse 5
Pleven / BG
04 / Djagarov, Zvetan Stefanov, Dipl.-Ing.
Komplex Storgosia
Pleven / BG
05 / Popov, Nikola Nikolov
Grenaderska-Strasse 84
Bl. Sadrushie Pleven / BG
[1985/19]
Representative(s)von Füner, Alexander , et al
v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1985/19]von Füner, Alexander, Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3
D-81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date84110022.522.08.1984
[1985/19]
Priority number, dateBG1983006219625.08.1983         Original published format: BG 6219683
[1985/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0139986
Date:08.05.1985
Language:DE
[1985/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0139986
Date:16.12.1987
Language:DE
[1987/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.1985
ClassificationInternational:C08L27/06, // (C08L27/06, 61:10, 97:02)
[1985/19]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1985/19]
TitleGerman:Polyvinylchlorid-Zusammensetzung[1985/19]
English:Polyvinyl chloride composition[1985/19]
French:Composition à base de polychlorure de vinyle[1985/19]
Examination procedure22.08.1985Examination requested  [1985/45]
29.05.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.12.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.1987Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
19.06.1987Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.09.1987Fee for grant paid
04.09.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.09.1988No opposition filed within time limit [1988/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB1064683  (GRP IND DE MANUFACTURES DE MEN)
 [Y]  - PLASTE UND KAUTSCHUK, Band 29, Heft 5, 1982, Seiten 277-278, Leipzig, DD; M. NATOW u.a.: "Füllung von Polyvinylchlorid mit Holzmehl"
Examination   - Encyclopedia of Polymer Science and Technology,1980, Vol. 10, Seite 57