Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0138061

EP0138061 - Method of determining speech spectra with an application to automatic speech recognition and speech coding [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.04.1989
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.04.1989No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.06.1989 [1989/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1985/17]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
D-80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Höge, Harald, Dr. phil. nat.
Hauptstrasse 19
D-8131 Unterbrunn / DE
[1985/17]
Application number, filing date84110889.712.09.1984
[1985/17]
Priority number, dateDE1983333535829.09.1983         Original published format: DE 3335358
[1985/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0138061
Date:24.04.1985
Language:DE
[1985/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0138061
Date:29.06.1988
Language:DE
[1988/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.03.1985
ClassificationInternational:G10L7/08
[1985/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1985/17]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Bestimmung von Sprachspektren für die automatische Spracherkennung und Sprachcodierung[1988/26]
English:Method of determining speech spectra with an application to automatic speech recognition and speech coding[1985/30]
French:Procédé pour la détermination de spectres de la parole en vue de la reconnaissance automatique et du codage de la parole[1985/30]
Former [1985/17]Verfahren zur Bestimmung von Sprachspektren für die automaische Spracherkennung und Sprachcodierung
Examination procedure27.08.1985Examination requested  [1985/45]
16.10.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.06.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.1987Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.12.1987Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.01.1988Fee for grant paid
11.01.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.03.1989No opposition filed within time limit [1989/24]
Request for further processing for:01.06.1987Request for further processing filed
01.06.1987Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.07.1987Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US3643226  (LOIZIDES EDWARD, et al)
 [A]  ELECTRONICS AND COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, Band 62-A,Nr. 12, Dezember 1979, Seiten 37-45, Scripta Publishing Co., Silver Spring, US; Y. MATSUYAMA: "Universal source coding and speech compression",
 [A]  ICASSP 82 PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, Paris, 3.-5. Mai 1982, Band 1, Seiten 593-596, IEEE, New York, US; R.M. GRAY et al.: "Full search and tree searched vector quantization of speech waveforms",
 [A]  PROCEEDINGS OF THE 6TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PATTERN RECOGNITION, München, 19.-22. Oktober 1982, Band 2, Seiten 969-972, IEEE, New York, US; E. REUHKALA: "Pattern recognition for strings of discrete symbols",