blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0143935

EP0143935 - Thermoplastic polymer and articles made of a thermoplastic polymer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  25.03.1994
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip29.11.1996Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 15.01.1997 [1997/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RB Kunststoffpatent-Verwertungs AG
Westbahnhofstrasse 11
CH-4500 Solothurn / CH
For all designated states
BELLAND AG
Sandmattstrasse 2
4500 Solothurn / CH
[N/P]
Former [1989/31]For all designated states
RB Kunststoffpatent-Verwertungs AG
Westbahnhofstrasse 11
CH-4500 Solothurn / CH
For all designated states
BELLAND AG
Sandmattstrasse 2
CH-4500 Solothurn / CH
Former [1988/19]For all designated states
RB Kunststoffpatent-Verwertungs AG
Westbahnhofstrasse 11
CH-4500 Solothurn / CH
For all designated states
BELLAND AG
Sandmattstrasse 2
CH-4500 Solothurn / CH
Former [1986/45]For all designated states
RB Kunststoffpatent-Verwertungs AG
Westbahnhofstrasse 11
CH-4500 Solothurn / CH
For all designated states
Belz, Roland Karl
Sonnenhalde 31
D-7022 Leinfelden-Echterdingen-1 / DE
Former [1985/24]For all designated states
BELLAND AG
Sandmattstrasse 2
CH-4500 Solothurn / CH
For all designated states
Belz, Roland Karl
Sonnenhalde 31
D-7022 Leinfelden-Echterdingen-1 / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Deibig, Heinrich, Dr.
Priessnitzstrasse 13
D-6000 Frankfurt/M. 90 / DE
02 / Belz, Roland Karl
Sonnenhalde 31
D-7022 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE
[1985/24]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB
Postfach 10 40 36
70035 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1985/24]Patentanwälte Ruff, Beier, Schöndorf und Mütschele
Willy-Brandt-Strasse 28
D-70173 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date84111508.227.09.1984
[1985/24]
Priority number, dateDE1983333595404.10.1983         Original published format: DE 3335954
[1985/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0143935
Date:12.06.1985
Language:DE
[1985/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0143935
Date:16.08.1989
Language:DE
[1989/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.02.1985
ClassificationIPC:C08F220/18, C08F220/06, C08F265/06, C08J5/18
[1985/24]
CPC:
B29C48/022 (EP,US); B29C48/83 (EP,US); B29C48/875 (EP,US);
B29C48/92 (EP,US); B29C2948/92704 (EP,US); B29C2948/92809 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92895 (EP,US); B29C48/12 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1985/24]
TitleGerman:Thermoplastisches Polymerisat und Gegenstände aus einem thermoplastischen Polymerisat[1985/24]
English:Thermoplastic polymer and articles made of a thermoplastic polymer[1985/24]
French:Polymére thermoplastique et articles fabriqués à partir d'un polymère thermoplastique[1985/24]
Examination procedure03.10.1985Examination requested  [1985/51]
29.09.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
05.03.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.09.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.01.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
28.11.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
10.01.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.04.1989Fee for grant paid
11.04.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.05.1990  17.07.1990  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
TFP / Patentabteilung
D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1990/27]
Opponent(s)01  10.05.1990  17.07.1990  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
TFP / Patentabteilung
D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE
19.07.1990Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.01.1991Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.02.1991Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
23.03.1991Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
19.07.1991Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
25.11.1991Reply to a communication from the opposition division
03.08.1992Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
10.12.1992Reply to a communication from the opposition division
12.10.1993Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1994/20]
12.10.1993Date of oral proceedings
22.12.1993Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.12.1993Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.09.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
01.09.1988Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]AU410709B  ;
 [A]AT309085B  (GOLDSCHMIDT AG TH [DE]);
 [X]DE2806862  (GAF CORP);
 [X]EP0071239  (GOODRICH CO B F [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.