Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0140246

EP0140246 - A thin film electroluminescent display device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.07.1988
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.07.1988No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.09.1988 [1988/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GTE Products Corporation
100 West 10th Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 / US
[1985/19]
Inventor(s)01 / Schrank, Martin P.
25 Howe St.
Ipswich, MA 01938 / US
02 / Ayyagari, Murthy S.
45 Mt. Vernon St.
North Reading, MA 01864 / US
03 / Shinn, Dennis B.
28 Colrain Rd
Topsfield, MA 01983 / US
[1985/19]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1985/19]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date84112241.911.10.1984
[1985/19]
Priority number, dateUS1983054022311.10.1983         Original published format: US 540223
[1985/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0140246
Date:08.05.1985
Language:EN
[1985/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0140246
Date:16.09.1987
Language:EN
[1987/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.02.1985
ClassificationInternational:H05B33/22
[1985/19]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1985/19]
TitleGerman:Dünnschicht-Elektrolumineszenzanzeige[1985/19]
English:A thin film electroluminescent display device[1985/19]
French:Dispositif d'affichage électroluminescent à film mince[1985/19]
File destroyed:17.07.1996
Examination procedure11.10.1984Examination requested  [1985/19]
13.06.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.10.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.12.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
24.03.1987Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.05.1987Fee for grant paid
26.05.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.06.1988No opposition filed within time limit [1988/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:SearchGB2039146  [ ] (GTE SYLVANIA INC);
 GB2109161  [ ] (SHARP KK);
 DE3114199  [ ] (LOHJA AB OY [FI]);
 US4312915  [ ] (FAN JOHN C C);
 US3560784  [ ] (STEELE GORDON N, et al)
    [] Thin Solid Films, Vol. 89, No. 2, March 12, 1982, Elsevier Sequoia, Netherlands S. BERTHIER "Optical Properties of Au-MgO Cermet Thin Films: Percolation Threshold and Grain Size Effect" pages 213-220 * totality *,
    [] Applied Physics Letters, Vol. 29, No. 8, October 15, 1976, Massachusetts, USA FAN. ZAVRACKY "Selective Black Absorbers using MgO/Au Cermet Films" pages 478-480 * totality *,