Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0140273

EP0140273 - Positive photoresist compositions having deep UV response, photosensitive elements and thermally stable photochemically imaged systems containing same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.07.1992
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.07.1992No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.09.1992 [1992/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HOECHST CELANESE CORPORATION
Route 202-206 North
Somerville, N.J. 08876 / US
[1989/45]
Former [1985/19]For all designated states
ALLIED CORPORATION
Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.)
Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hopf, F. R.
c/o Allied Corporation P.O. Box 2245R
Morristown, NJ 07960 / US
02 / Osuch, C. E.
c/o Allied Corporation P.O. Box 2245R
Morristown, NJ 07960 / US
03 / McFarland, M. J.
c/o Allied Corporation P.O. Box 2245R
Morristown, NJ 07960 / US
[1985/19]
Representative(s)De Minvielle-Devaux, Ian Benedict Peter , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
[1989/42]
Former [1987/33]Brock, Peter William
UOP Processes International Corporation 48 Leicester Square
London WC2H 7LW / GB
Former [1985/19]Baillie, Iain Cameron
Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2
D-80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date84112439.916.10.1984
[1985/19]
Priority number, dateUS1983054781501.11.1983         Original published format: US 547815
[1985/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0140273
Date:08.05.1985
Language:EN
[1985/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0140273
Date:24.06.1987
Language:EN
[1987/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0140273
Date:11.09.1991
Language:EN
[1991/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.05.1987
ClassificationInternational:G03F7/038
[1991/37]
Former International [1985/19]G03F7/10
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1985/19]
TitleGerman:Tief UV-empfindliche positive Photolackzusammensetzung, lichtempfindliches Element und dasselbe enthaltendes gegen Hitze widerstandsfähiges photochemisches Bild[1985/30]
English:Positive photoresist compositions having deep UV response, photosensitive elements and thermally stable photochemically imaged systems containing same[1985/19]
French:Composition pour photoréserve sensible dans l'UV profond, élément photosensible et image photochimique résistante à la chaleur le contenant[1985/30]
Examination procedure22.12.1987Examination requested  [1988/08]
06.02.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.06.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
28.02.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
12.03.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.04.1991Fee for grant paid
12.04.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.06.1992No opposition filed within time limit [1992/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.09.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
19.10.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
13.10.1988Renewal fee patent year 05
05.10.1989Renewal fee patent year 06
29.09.1990Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0021019  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]);
 [A]DE2462101  (SIEMENS AG);
 [A]EP0094913  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]);
 [A]DE2349948  (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN)
 [A]  PHOTOGRAPHIC SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING, vol. 27, no. 3, May/June 1983, pages 114-118, Society of Photographic Scientists and Engineers, Easton, Pennsylvania, US; H. ZWEIFEL: "Polymers with pendent dimethylmaleimide groups as highly sensitive photocrosslinkable systems",