Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0149734

EP0149734 - Continuous casting mould for steel slabs [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  26.01.1993
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMS SCHLOEMANN-SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4
D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE
[1985/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Kolakowski, Manfred
Ernst-Moritz-Arndt-Strasse 5
D-4006 Erkrath 1 / DE
02 / Streubel, Hans
Schinkelstrasse 32
D-4006 Erkrath 1 / DE
[1985/31]
Representative(s)Müller, Gerd , et al
Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2
D-57072 Siegen / DE
[1985/31]
Application number, filing date84112850.725.10.1984
[1985/31]
Priority number, dateDE1984340022005.01.1984         Original published format: DE 3400220
[1985/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0149734
Date:31.07.1985
Language:DE
[1985/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0149734
Date:02.07.1986
Language:DE
[1986/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0149734
Date:20.04.1988
Language:DE
[1988/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.05.1986
ClassificationInternational:B22D11/04
[1985/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1985/31]
TitleGerman:Kokille zum Stranggiessen von Stahlband[1985/31]
English:Continuous casting mould for steel slabs[1985/31]
French:Lingotière pour la coulée continue d'un ruban d'acier[1985/31]
Examination procedure02.11.1984Examination requested  [1985/31]
10.08.1987Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
14.10.1987Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.11.1987Fee for grant paid
12.11.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.08.1988  12.08.1988  ADMISSIBLE
DANIELI & C. OFFICINE MECCANICHE SpA
Via Nazionale
I-33042 Buttrio (UD) / IT
Opponent's representative
Petraz, Gilberto Luigi
GLP S.r.l.
Viale Europa Unita, 171
33100 Udine / IT
 02  07.01.1989  24.01.1989  ADMISSIBLE
VOEST-ALPINE Industrieanlagenbau Gesellschaft m.b.H.
Turmstr. 44
A-4020 Linz / AT
Opponent's representative
Wolfram, Gustav
Patentanwälte Sonn, Pawloy, Weinzinger & Wolfram, Riemergasse 14
1010 Wien / AT
 [N/P]
Former [1989/09]
Opponent(s)01  12.08.1988  12.08.1988  ADMISSIBLE
DANIELI & C. OFFICINE MECCANICHE SpA
Via Nazionale
I-33042 Buttrio (UD) / IT
Opponent's representative
Petraz, Gilberto Luigi
GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2
I-33100 Udine / IT
 02  07.01.1989  24.01.1989  ADMISSIBLE
VOEST-ALPINE Industrieanlagenbau Gesellschaft m.b.H.
Turmstr. 44
A-4020 Linz / AT
Opponent's representative
Wolfram, Gustav, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Sonn, Pawloy, Weinzinger & Wolfram, Riemergasse 14
A-1010 Wien / AT
Former [1988/39]
Opponent(s)01  12.08.1988  12.08.1988  ADMISSIBLE
DANIELI & C. OFFICINE MECCANICHE SpA
Via Nazionale
I-33042 Buttrio (UD) / IT
Opponent's representative
Petraz, Gilberto Luigi
GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2
I-33100 Udine / IT
22.02.1989Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.06.1989Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.06.1989Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
17.10.1989Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
21.12.1990Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
22.01.1993Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1993/11]
Appeal following opposition12.02.1991Appeal received No.  T0143/91
09.04.1991Statement of grounds filed
24.09.1992Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
24.09.1992Date of oral proceedings
07.10.1992Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
02.10.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US2564723  (IRVING ROSSI);
 [A]DE1809744  (CONTINUA INTERNAT CONTINUOUS C);
 [A]DE1508809  (CONTINUA INTERNAT CONTINUOUS C)