Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0149734 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0149734



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 586
29.01.1993 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.01.1993 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
22.01.1993 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
22.01.1993 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
22.01.1993 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
07.10.1992 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
07.10.1992 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
07.10.1992 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
24.09.1992 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 23
24.09.1992 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
02.09.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
02.09.1992 Authorisation of representative Appeal 2
02.09.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.09.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.08.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.08.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.08.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.08.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
21.08.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.08.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.08.1992 Annex Appeal 5
19.08.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
19.08.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 50
19.08.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
19.08.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 17
19.08.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
19.08.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
19.08.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 22
17.08.1992 Claims Appeal 1
17.08.1992 Description Appeal 2
17.08.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
14.08.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
31.07.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.07.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.07.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
13.07.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
24.06.1992 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.06.1992 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.06.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
19.06.1992 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.06.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.06.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.06.1992 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
12.06.1992 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
12.06.1992 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
12.06.1992 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
12.06.1992 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
12.06.1992 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
09.06.1992 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 4
29.05.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
27.05.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 11
24.02.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.02.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.02.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
11.02.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 36
22.01.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.01.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.01.1992 Annex Appeal 1
15.01.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
08.11.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.11.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.10.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 18
09.09.1991 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
09.09.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.09.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.08.1991 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
29.04.1991 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
29.04.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.04.1991 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
19.04.1991 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 24
19.04.1991 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 15
19.04.1991 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 14
17.04.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.04.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.04.1991 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
11.04.1991 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
09.04.1991 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
08.04.1991 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
08.04.1991 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
08.04.1991 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
15.02.1991 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
12.02.1991 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
08.01.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.01.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.12.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
21.12.1990 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
21.12.1990 Annex to the communication Opposition 12
21.12.1990 Annex to the communication Opposition 7
21.12.1990 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
21.12.1990 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
21.12.1990 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
21.12.1990 Means of redress Opposition 1
21.12.1990 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
03.11.1990 Annex Opposition 1
03.11.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.09.1990 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.09.1990 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.09.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
05.04.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
02.04.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.03.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.03.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.03.1990 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
20.03.1990 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
20.03.1990 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.03.1990 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
20.03.1990 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
20.03.1990 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
27.02.1990 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.02.1990 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.02.1990 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.02.1990 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.02.1990 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.01.1990 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.01.1990 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.01.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
25.10.1989 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.10.1989 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 5
04.10.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.10.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.09.1989 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.09.1989 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.09.1989 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
23.08.1989 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.08.1989 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
11.08.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.08.1989 Annex Opposition 1
08.08.1989 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
07.08.1989 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
03.08.1989 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 2
22.06.1989 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
22.06.1989 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
14.06.1989 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
22.02.1989 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
22.02.1989 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
22.02.1989 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
18.01.1989 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
07.01.1989 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
07.01.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
19.12.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.12.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.12.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.12.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.08.1988 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
27.07.1988 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
27.07.1988 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
27.04.1988 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
10.03.1988 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
02.01.1988 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
02.01.1988 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
02.01.1988 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
14.10.1987 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
15.09.1987 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
08.09.1987 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
08.09.1987 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
08.09.1987 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
02.09.1987 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 3
02.09.1987 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
10.08.1987 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
10.08.1987 Text intended for grant Search / examination 12
29.06.1987 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
03.03.1987 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
18.11.1986 Annex Search / examination 1
18.11.1986 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
13.11.1986 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
08.07.1986 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
09.05.1986 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.05.1986 European search report Search / examination 2
05.06.1985 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
25.10.1984 Abstract Search / examination 1
25.10.1984 Claims Search / examination 3
25.10.1984 Description Search / examination 4
25.10.1984 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
25.10.1984 Drawings Search / examination 2
25.10.1984 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.10.1984 Priority document Search / examination 11
25.10.1984 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10