Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0144783 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0144783



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 119
14.06.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
29.09.1989 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
26.04.1989 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
25.04.1989 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.04.1989 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 15
25.04.1989 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 15
25.04.1989 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
14.01.1989 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
11.01.1989 Communication (no form) Appeal 3
11.01.1989 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
09.01.1989 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
30.03.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
04.02.1988 Processing of an appeal Search / examination 1
18.01.1988 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 3
14.01.1988 Closing of application Search / examination 1
17.12.1987 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
16.10.1987 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
12.10.1987 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 6
10.09.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
24.06.1987 Claims Search / examination 1
24.06.1987 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
23.02.1987 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.01.1987 Claims Search / examination 1
28.01.1987 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.10.1986 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
30.07.1985 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
30.07.1985 Translation of priority document Search / examination 9
29.06.1985 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
28.06.1985 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
24.04.1985 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
28.03.1985 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
28.03.1985 European search report Search / examination 2
13.02.1985 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
13.02.1985 Priority document Search / examination 11
07.11.1984 Abstract Search / examination 1
07.11.1984 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
07.11.1984 Claims Search / examination 1
07.11.1984 Description Search / examination 5
07.11.1984 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.11.1984 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.11.1984 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10