Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0143425 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0143425



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 464
24.08.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
15.02.1993 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
15.02.1993 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
07.01.1993 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
05.01.1993 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.01.1993 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.01.1993 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.01.1993 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
10.07.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.07.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.07.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.06.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
25.06.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
15.06.1992 Communication regarding the examination of the appeal (ex parte) Appeal 1
15.06.1992 Communication regarding the examination of the appeal (ex parte) Appeal 3
15.06.1992 Communication regarding the examination of the appeal (ex parte) Appeal 1
03.06.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
13.05.1992 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
13.05.1992 Communication (no form) Appeal 3
12.05.1992 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
12.05.1992 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
11.05.1992 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
06.05.1992 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
06.05.1992 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
06.05.1992 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
06.05.1992 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
06.05.1992 Refund of fees Appeal 1
04.05.1992 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
18.03.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.03.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.03.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.03.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.03.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.03.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
09.03.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.03.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.03.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.03.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.02.1992 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 2
27.02.1992 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 1
27.02.1992 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.02.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.01.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.11.1991 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
05.11.1991 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
05.11.1991 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
31.10.1991 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
31.10.1991 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
31.10.1991 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
31.10.1991 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
31.10.1991 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
31.10.1991 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 6
28.10.1991 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
23.10.1991 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
23.10.1991 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.10.1991 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.10.1991 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.10.1991 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.10.1991 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
24.06.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.06.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.06.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.06.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
17.06.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
02.05.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.05.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.04.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
27.03.1991 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
27.03.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.03.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.03.1991 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
21.12.1990 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
21.12.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.12.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.12.1990 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
31.10.1990 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
31.10.1990 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
27.08.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.08.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.08.1990 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
21.08.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
17.08.1990 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
17.08.1990 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
13.07.1990 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.07.1990 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.07.1990 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.07.1990 Notice of appeal Appeal 10
21.06.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.06.1990 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
17.05.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.05.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.05.1990 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
15.05.1990 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
15.05.1990 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
15.05.1990 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 12
15.05.1990 Means of redress Opposition 1
26.04.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.04.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.04.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.04.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
15.02.1990 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
02.02.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.02.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.01.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
24.01.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
25.10.1989 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
18.08.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.08.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.08.1989 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.07.1989 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
27.07.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.07.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.07.1989 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
20.07.1989 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
20.07.1989 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 5
11.04.1989 Annex to the communication Opposition 5
11.04.1989 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
23.11.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.11.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.11.1988 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 4
16.09.1988 Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.08.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.08.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.08.1988 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 4
07.06.1988 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
26.05.1988 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
11.02.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.02.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.02.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
29.01.1988 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
29.01.1988 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
22.01.1988 Description Opposition 1
22.01.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
22.01.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.01.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.01.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
22.01.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
22.01.1988 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 8
23.09.1987 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
23.09.1987 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
23.09.1987 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
16.09.1987 Authorisation Opposition 1
16.09.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
31.07.1987 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
20.07.1987 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
15.07.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.07.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
15.07.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
15.07.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
15.07.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
15.07.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
15.07.1987 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
11.07.1987 Authorisation Opposition 1
11.07.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.07.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.07.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
11.07.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.07.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
11.07.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.07.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.07.1987 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
10.09.1986 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
16.04.1986 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
16.04.1986 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
16.04.1986 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
10.04.1986 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
03.04.1986 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
01.04.1986 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
01.04.1986 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
17.03.1986 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
18.02.1986 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
11.02.1986 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
07.12.1985 Annex Search / examination 1
07.12.1985 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
21.11.1985 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
13.11.1985 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
05.11.1985 Annex Search / examination 1
05.11.1985 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
05.11.1985 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
28.10.1985 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 2
21.10.1985 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
17.10.1985 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
30.08.1985 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
30.08.1985 European search report Search / examination 2
24.07.1985 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
09.07.1985 General enquiry Search / examination 1
11.04.1985 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
10.01.1985 Authorisation Search / examination 2
10.01.1985 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.01.1985 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
20.11.1984 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.11.1984 Claims Search / examination 3
20.11.1984 Description Search / examination 13
20.11.1984 Drawings Search / examination 6
20.11.1984 Priority document Search / examination 19
20.11.1984 Priority document Search / examination 26
20.11.1984 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 12