Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0144882

EP0144882 - Traffic responsive control system for automatic swinging door [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.06.1988
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.05.2016Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE STANLEY WORKS
195, Lake Street
New Britain, CT 06050 / US
[1985/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Kornbrekke, Henning N.
Orchard Road
Burlington, CT 06013 / US
02 / Cirkot, David M.
2 Bennet Terrace
Ansonia, CT 06401 / US
03 / Ranaudo, Anthony R.
63 Woodbine Street
Naugatuck, CT 06770 / US
[1985/25]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 13 03 91
20103 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1985/25]Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner
Patentanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58
D-20148 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date84114244.126.11.1984
[1985/25]
Priority number, dateUS1983055556528.11.1983         Original published format: US 555565
US1984058740708.03.1984         Original published format: US 587407
[1985/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0144882
Date:19.06.1985
Language:EN
[1985/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0144882
Date:30.10.1985
Language:EN
[1985/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0144882
Date:20.07.1988
Language:EN
[1988/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.08.1985
ClassificationInternational:E05F15/20, E05F15/12
[1985/25]
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1985/25]
TitleGerman:Verkehrsabhängiges Steuersystem für eine automatische Flügeltür[1985/25]
English:Traffic responsive control system for automatic swinging door[1985/25]
French:Système de commande basé sur le traffic pour porte automatique[1985/25]
Examination procedure04.04.1986Examination requested  [1986/24]
18.05.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.09.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.11.1987Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.01.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.04.1988Fee for grant paid
15.04.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.04.1989  28.09.1994  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
BESAM AB/Jönsson, Bert Ove
Box 131/Rödbenavägen 6
S-261 22 Landskrona/S-230 44 Vintrie / SE
Opponent's representative
AWA Sweden AB, et al
P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/02]
Opponent(s)01  19.04.1989  28.09.1994  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
BESAM AB/Jönsson, Bert Ove
Box 131/Rödbenavägen 6
S-261 22 Landskrona/S-230 44 Vintrie / SE
Opponent's representative
Awapatent AB, et al
P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
Former [2006/27]
Opponent(s)01  19.04.1989  28.09.1994  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
BESAM AB/Jönsson, Bert Ove
Box 131/Rödbenavägen 6
S-261 22 Landskrona/S-230 44 Vintrie / SE
Opponent's representative
Jörgensson, Leif Sixten, et al
Awapatent AB P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
Former [1995/16]
Opponent(s)01  19.04.1989  28.09.1994  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
BESAM AB/Jönsson, Bert Ove
Box 131/Rödbenavägen 6
S-261 22 Landskrona/S-230 44 Vintrie / SE
Opponent's representative
Rostovanyi, Peter, et al
AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117
S-200 71 Malmö / SE
Former [1989/25]
Opponent(s)01  19.04.1989   
BESAM AB/Jönsson, Bert Ove
Box 131/Rödbenavägen 6
S-261 22 Landskrona/S-230 44 Vintrie / SE
Opponent's representative
Rostovanyi, Peter, et al
AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117
S-200 71 Malmö / SE
01.06.1989Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.09.1989Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.10.1989Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
05.10.1990Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
Appeal following opposition12.08.1991Appeal received No.  T0621/91
15.10.1991Statement of grounds filed
28.09.1994Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
28.09.1994Date of oral proceedings
13.10.1994Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.05.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
15.03.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.12.198603   M06   Fee paid on   20.05.1987
30.11.198704   M06   Fee paid on   15.03.1988
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB25.11.2004
NL26.11.2004
[2006/24]
Former [2005/45]GB25.11.2004
Documents cited:Search[AD]US4220051  ;
 [A]US4272921  ;
 [A]US3874117  ;
 [A]EP0087977  ;
 [A]FR2389750
ExaminationCA1082788