Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0144882 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0144882



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 770
17.05.2018 Request concerning representative opponent Search / examination 3
18.05.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
10.12.2015 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
27.12.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
24.02.1995 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
23.02.1995 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
23.02.1995 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
13.11.1994 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
13.10.1994 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
28.09.1994 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 18
28.09.1994 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
27.09.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
26.09.1994 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
22.09.1994 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
19.09.1994 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
07.09.1994 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
07.09.1994 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 2
07.09.1994 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
09.08.1994 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
08.08.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.08.1994 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
30.06.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
30.06.1994 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.06.1994 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
21.06.1994 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
21.06.1994 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
21.06.1994 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
21.06.1994 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
21.06.1994 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
21.06.1994 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 2
15.06.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
14.06.1994 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.03.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
26.08.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
18.02.1992 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 1
10.02.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
24.10.1991 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
15.10.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
15.10.1991 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
23.09.1991 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
17.09.1991 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
12.08.1991 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
18.06.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.06.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.06.1991 Decision concerning the inadmissibility of the opposition to opponent Opposition 3
11.06.1991 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 7
11.02.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.01.1991 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
27.12.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.12.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
10.12.1990 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 10
05.10.1990 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
05.10.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
02.05.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
19.03.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
15.03.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.03.1990 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.03.1990 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.03.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
02.03.1990 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
02.03.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
02.03.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
02.03.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
02.03.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
02.03.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
02.03.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.03.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
02.03.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
02.03.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
02.03.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
02.03.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
02.03.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
02.03.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
02.03.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
02.03.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
02.03.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.03.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
02.03.1990 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
01.03.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.02.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 95
13.02.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.02.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.02.1990 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
10.01.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.12.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.12.1989 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
15.12.1989 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.12.1989 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.12.1989 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.1989 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
16.11.1989 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.1989 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
16.11.1989 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.10.1989 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
29.09.1989 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
06.06.1989 Refund of fees Opposition 1
01.06.1989 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
01.06.1989 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
20.05.1989 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.05.1989 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
16.05.1989 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
16.05.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 2
04.05.1989 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
24.04.1989 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
24.04.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
24.04.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
24.04.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
24.04.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
24.04.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
24.04.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 2
24.04.1989 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
20.04.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
19.04.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
09.06.1988 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
15.04.1988 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.04.1988 Translation of the claims Search / examination 12
15.04.1988 Translation of the claims Search / examination 12
18.01.1988 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
07.01.1988 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
06.11.1987 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.11.1987 Text intended for grant Search / examination 47
29.10.1987 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
18.09.1987 Claims Search / examination 11
18.09.1987 Description Search / examination 4
18.09.1987 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.05.1987 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
12.01.1987 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
06.11.1985 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
22.08.1985 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.08.1985 European search report Search / examination 2
24.04.1985 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
14.01.1985 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
14.01.1985 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.01.1985 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
24.12.1984 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
24.12.1984 Priority document Search / examination 55
24.12.1984 Priority document Search / examination 46
26.11.1984 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.11.1984 Claims Search / examination 11
26.11.1984 Description Search / examination 30
26.11.1984 Drawings Search / examination 7
26.11.1984 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.11.1984 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10
20.05.1981 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1