blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0156996

EP0156996 - Engine valve timing control system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.03.1989
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.1989No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.05.1989 [1989/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALLIED CORPORATION
Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown
New Jersey 07960 / US
[N/P]
Former [1985/41]For all designated states
ALLIED CORPORATION
Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.)
Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Wakeman, Russell J.
c/o Allied Corporation P.O. Box 5060
Southfield Michigan 48086 / US
[1985/41]
Representative(s)Lejet, Christian, et al
BENDIX FRANCE Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126 rue de Stalingrad
93700 Drancy / FR
[N/P]
Former [1988/33]Lejet, Christian, et al
BENDIX FRANCE Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126 rue de Stalingrad
F-93700 Drancy / FR
Former [1985/41]Brullé, Jean
Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad
F-93700 Drancy / FR
Application number, filing date84115936.120.12.1984
[1985/41]
Priority number, dateUS1984057535530.01.1984         Original published format: US 575355
[1985/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0156996
Date:09.10.1985
Language:EN
[1985/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0156996
Date:18.05.1988
Language:EN
[1988/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.06.1985
ClassificationIPC:F01L31/22, F01L9/02
[1985/41]
CPC:
F01L13/0021 (EP); F01L13/0031 (EP); F01L9/10 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1985/41]
TitleGerman:Ventilsteuerungsregelungssystem für Brennkraftmaschine[1985/41]
English:Engine valve timing control system[1985/41]
French:Système de contrôle pour le timonerie des soupapes d'un moteur[1985/41]
Examination procedure12.03.1986Examination requested  [1986/23]
25.08.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.12.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
02.05.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.1987Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
19.11.1987Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.02.1988Fee for grant paid
05.02.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.02.1989No opposition filed within time limit [1989/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
09.12.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3612015  (HAUSKNECHT LOUIS A);
 [A]US3786792  (PELIZZONI W, et al);
 [A]US4000756  (ULE LOUIS A, et al);
 [Y]US4009695  (ULE LOUIS A);
 [Y]GB2107393  (LUCAS IND PLC)
ExaminationUS3439661
 US4111165
 US4112884
 US4258671
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.