blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0131984

EP0131984 - A locking device for coupling containers and the like to railway trucks [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.09.1988
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.1999Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CONSIGLIO NAZIONALE DELLE RICERCHE
Piazzale Aldo Moro, 7
00198 Roma / IT
[N/P]
Former [1985/04]For all designated states
CONSIGLIO NAZIONALE DELLE RICERCHE
Piazzale Aldo Moro, 7
I-00198 Roma / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Eustachio, Fiore
vico I Nazionale, 21
Matera / IT
[1985/04]
Representative(s)Russo, Saverio
Ing. S. Russo & C. s.r.l.
Via Ottavio Serena, 37
70126 Bari / IT
[N/P]
Former [1985/04]Russo, Saverio, Dott. Ing.
Via Ottavio Serena, 37
I-70126 Bari / IT
Application number, filing date84200889.820.06.1984
[1985/04]
Priority number, dateIT1983000211520.06.1983         Original published format: IT 211583
[1985/04]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0131984
Date:23.01.1985
Language:EN
[1985/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0131984
Date:11.12.1985
Language:EN
[1985/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0131984
Date:02.12.1987
Language:EN
[1987/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.10.1985
ClassificationIPC:B61D3/16
[1985/04]
CPC:
B61D45/007 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1985/04]
TitleGerman:Verriegelungsvorrichtung, um Behälter oder ähnliche auf Eisenbahnflachwagen zu befestigen[1985/04]
English:A locking device for coupling containers and the like to railway trucks[1985/04]
French:Dispositif de verrouillage pour fixer des porteurs de charge tels que des conteneurs sur des wagons plats[1985/04]
File destroyed:15.01.2000
Examination procedure23.04.1985Examination requested  [1985/29]
09.10.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
23.01.1987Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.04.1987Fee for grant paid
15.04.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.09.1988No opposition filed within time limit [1988/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.198704   M06   Fee paid on   25.09.1987
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.12.1987
CH02.12.1987
LI02.12.1987
NL02.12.1987
SE31.12.1987
GB20.06.1988
LU30.06.1988
[1999/52]
Former [1989/32]AT02.12.1987
CH02.12.1987
LI02.12.1987
NL02.12.1987
SE31.12.1987
GB20.06.1988
Former [1989/25]AT02.12.1987
CH02.12.1987
LI02.12.1987
NL02.12.1987
SE31.12.1987
Former [1989/21]AT02.12.1987
NL02.12.1987
SE31.12.1987
Former [1989/13]AT02.12.1987
NL02.12.1987
Former [1989/10]NL02.12.1987
Documents cited:Search[A]US3272150  (DEMPSTER JAMES W, et al);
 [A]US4163425  (BEDARD VICTOR [CA]);
 [A]FR2504484  (ANF IND [FR])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.