Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0140410

EP0140410 - Novel enzyme product and its use in the saccharification of starch [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  18.10.1996
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GIST-BROCADES N.V.
Wateringseweg 1 P.O. Box 1
NL-2600 MA Delft / NL
[1985/19]
Inventor(s)01 / Ducroo, Paul
Rue Mermoz 6
F-59133 Phalempin / FR
02 / Labout, Johannes Jacobus Maria
Alberdingk Thijmlaan 8
NL-2106 EK Heemstede / NL
03 / Noordam, Bertus
Wagenaarhof 19
NL-2692 BJ 's-Gravenzande / NL
[1985/19]
Representative(s)Armitage, Ian Michael , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
York House
23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/49]Armitage, Ian Michael , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Former [1985/19]Huygens, Arthur Victor, Dr.
c/o Gist-Brocades N.V. Patents & Trademarks Department Martinus Nijhofflaan 2 PO Box 1
NL-2600 MA Delft / NL
Application number, filing date84201301.310.09.1984
[1985/19]
Priority number, dateEP1983020130311.09.1983         Original published format: EP 83201303
[1985/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0140410
Date:08.05.1985
Language:EN
[1985/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0140410
Date:17.11.1988
Language:EN
[1988/46]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0140410
Date:04.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/49]
Type: B2 RE Reissue of amended patent specification 
No.:EP0140410
Date:26.11.1997
[1997/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.1985
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/30, C12N9/34, C12P19/20
[1985/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1985/19]
TitleGerman:Enzymprodukt und seine Verwendung in der Verzuckerung von Stärke[1985/19]
English:Novel enzyme product and its use in the saccharification of starch[1985/19]
French:Produit enzymatique et son application dans la saccharification de l'amidon[1985/19]
Examination procedure30.05.1985Examination requested  [1985/34]
12.11.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
22.04.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.12.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.05.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.05.1988Fee for grant paid
30.05.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.08.1989  28.08.1989  ADMISSIBLE
Kali-Chemie Aktiengesellschaft
Hans-Böckler-Alle 20
D-30173 Hannover / DE
 02  16.08.1989  13.10.1989  ADMISSIBLE
Novo-Nordisk A/S
Novo Alle
DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Opponent's representative
Brown, John D.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1989/41]
Opponent(s)01  12.08.1989  28.08.1989  ADMISSIBLE
Kali-Chemie Aktiengesellschaft
Hans-Böckler-Alle 20
D-30173 Hannover / DE
 02  16.08.1989  13.10.1989  ADMISSIBLE
Novo-Nordisk A/S
Novo Alle
DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Opponent's representative
Brown, John David
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
D-80801 München / DE
18.10.1989Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.05.1990Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.12.1994Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
23.02.1995Reply to a communication from the opposition division
13.03.1995Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
18.05.1995Reply to a communication from the opposition division
31.07.1995Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
08.12.1995Reply to a communication from the opposition division
11.03.1996Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.04.1996Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
02.07.1996Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
30.09.1996Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition14.01.1991Appeal received No.  T0089/91
19.04.1991Statement of grounds filed
09.11.1993Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
09.11.1993Date of oral proceedings
15.11.1993Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.07.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
24.08.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.1988Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]GB1037710  ;
 [A]GB2016476  ;
 [A]US4284722  ;
 [AD]EP0063909  ;
 [A]GB1106421  ;
 [A]US4017363
 [X]  - DIE STÄRKE, vol. 27, no. 11, November 1975, pages 377-383, Weinheim, DE; J.J. MARSHALL: "Starch-degrading enzymes, old and new"
 [X]  - STARCH/STÄRKE, vol. 30, no. 8, 1978, pages 272-275, Verlag Chemie GmbH, Weinheim, DE; N. RAMACHANDRAN et al.: "Studies on the thermophilic amylolytic enzymes of a strain of Aspergillus niger"
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 73, no. 17, 26th October 1970, page 35, no. 84092z, Columbus, Ohio, USA; J.J. MARSHALL et al.: "Incomplete conversion of glycogen and starch by crystalline amyloglucosidase and its importance in the determination of amylaceous polymers" & FEBS (FED. EUR. BIOCHEM. SOC.) LETT.
 [A]  - STARCH/STÄRKE, vol. 30, no. 10, 1978, pages 341-345, Verlag Chemie GmbH, Weinheim, DE; P. FINCH et al.: "Comparative studies on glucoamylases isolated from a strain of Aspergillus"
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 96, no. 3, 18th January 1982, page 208, no. 17141b, Columbus, Ohio, USA; G.I. KVESITADZE et al.: "Selection of microscopic fungi producing acid-stable alpha-amylase and glucoamylase" & MIKROBIOLOGIYA 1981, 50(5), 807-812
 [A]  - DIE STÄRKE, vol. 27, no. 4, 1975, pages 123-128, Weinheim, DE; S. UEDA et al.: "Multiple forms of glucoamylase of rhizopus species"