Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0140410 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0140410



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 782
11.03.2004 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
18.12.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
13.02.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.02.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.02.1997 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
10.02.1997 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
04.02.1997 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
30.01.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
21.01.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
23.12.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.12.1996 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
29.11.1996 Withdrawal of an opposition Opposition 1
27.11.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.11.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
21.11.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
25.10.1996 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
25.10.1996 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
25.10.1996 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
23.10.1996 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
19.09.1996 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
19.09.1996 Translation of the claims Opposition 1
19.09.1996 Translation of the claims Opposition 2
02.07.1996 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
02.07.1996 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
02.07.1996 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
02.07.1996 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
26.06.1996 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
21.06.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
17.06.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.03.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.03.1996 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.03.1996 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.03.1996 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.03.1996 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
11.03.1996 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.03.1996 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.03.1996 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.03.1996 Text intended for grant Opposition 13
16.02.1996 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
29.01.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.01.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.01.1996 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
12.12.1995 Description Opposition 2
12.12.1995 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.12.1995 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
17.11.1995 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
24.10.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.10.1995 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
06.10.1995 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
06.10.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.10.1995 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 3
31.07.1995 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
31.07.1995 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
06.06.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.06.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.05.1995 Description Opposition 1
24.05.1995 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.05.1995 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
13.03.1995 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
13.03.1995 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
02.03.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.03.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.02.1995 Claims Opposition 2
23.02.1995 Description Opposition 2
23.02.1995 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.12.1994 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
22.12.1994 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
12.12.1994 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
12.12.1994 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
12.12.1994 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
15.11.1993 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
15.11.1993 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
15.11.1993 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
09.11.1993 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
09.11.1993 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
09.11.1993 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
08.11.1993 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 2
08.11.1993 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 4
08.11.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 20
07.11.1993 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
07.11.1993 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 8
07.11.1993 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
07.11.1993 Claims Appeal 1
07.11.1993 Claims Appeal 1
07.11.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
05.11.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.11.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.11.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
05.11.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
25.10.1993 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
23.08.1993 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.08.1993 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
20.08.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
19.08.1993 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.08.1993 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
16.08.1993 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
16.08.1993 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
12.08.1993 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
10.08.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
05.08.1993 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
05.08.1993 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
05.08.1993 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
24.02.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.02.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.02.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
05.12.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
08.11.1991 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
08.11.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.11.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.11.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
10.09.1991 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
10.09.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.09.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.09.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
25.04.1991 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
25.04.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.04.1991 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
19.04.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.04.1991 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
19.04.1991 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
19.04.1991 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
19.04.1991 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
19.04.1991 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
19.04.1991 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
19.04.1991 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
19.04.1991 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 20
17.04.1991 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
22.03.1991 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
13.02.1991 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
13.02.1991 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
13.02.1991 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
12.02.1991 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
12.02.1991 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
12.02.1991 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
07.02.1991 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
14.01.1991 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
14.01.1991 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
15.12.1990 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
13.12.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.12.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
10.12.1990 Annex to the communication Opposition 6
10.12.1990 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 15
10.12.1990 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
10.12.1990 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
10.12.1990 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
10.12.1990 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 1
10.12.1990 Text intended for grant Opposition 13
23.11.1990 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
29.10.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
29.10.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.10.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
18.10.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
18.10.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
18.10.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
18.10.1990 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
15.10.1990 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
15.10.1990 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
12.10.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
02.10.1990 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
19.09.1990 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
18.09.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
18.09.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
13.09.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.09.1990 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
11.09.1990 Annex to the communication Opposition 5
11.09.1990 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.09.1990 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
11.09.1990 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
11.09.1990 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
06.09.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
03.09.1990 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
27.08.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
27.08.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
24.08.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
24.08.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
16.08.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
16.08.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
15.08.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
13.08.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
10.08.1990 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.1990 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.1990 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.07.1990 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.06.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.06.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.06.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.06.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 16
05.06.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
01.06.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 16
01.06.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
28.05.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.05.1990 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
15.05.1990 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
10.05.1990 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
09.05.1990 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
03.05.1990 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
02.03.1990 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
27.02.1990 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
23.02.1990 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
18.10.1989 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
18.10.1989 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
18.10.1989 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
24.08.1989 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
24.08.1989 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.08.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.08.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
16.08.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.08.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.08.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.08.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
16.08.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
16.08.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.08.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
16.08.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
16.08.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.08.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 21
16.08.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
12.08.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
12.08.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
12.08.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
06.10.1988 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
30.05.1988 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
30.05.1988 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
30.05.1988 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
18.05.1988 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
17.05.1988 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
24.03.1988 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
15.03.1988 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.03.1988 Text intended for grant Search / examination 34
28.01.1988 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
15.12.1987 Claims Search / examination 2
15.12.1987 Description Search / examination 4
15.12.1987 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.10.1987 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
22.04.1987 Annex Search / examination 5
22.04.1987 Claims Search / examination 2
22.04.1987 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
15.04.1987 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
03.04.1987 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.03.1987 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.11.1986 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
23.10.1985 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
28.09.1985 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
30.05.1985 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
30.05.1985 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
30.05.1985 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
17.05.1985 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
13.03.1985 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
05.03.1985 Refund of (partial) search fee Search / examination 1
28.02.1985 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
28.02.1985 European search report Search / examination 4
10.09.1984 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.09.1984 Claims Search / examination 2
10.09.1984 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 4
10.09.1984 Description Search / examination 21
10.09.1984 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.09.1984 Drawings Search / examination 1
10.09.1984 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
10.09.1984 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
10.09.1984 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
10.09.1984 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
10.09.1984 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
10.09.1984 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
10.09.1984 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
10.09.1984 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
10.09.1984 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
10.09.1984 Priority document Search / examination 18
10.09.1984 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
06.09.1984 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1