blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0151830

EP0151830 - Process for the quick and controlled setting of a hydraulic binder containing both Portland cement and alumina cement, hydraulic binder, as well as a process for the manufacture of building elements [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1985/34]Process for the quick and controlled setting of a hydraulic binder containing both Portland cement and alumina cement, hydraulic binder, mixture of a hydraulic binder and an aggregate, as well as a process for the manufacture of building elements
[1988/30]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  17.06.1993
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Industriele Maatschappij Veldhoen B.V.
Almelosestraat 83
NL-8102 HC Raalte / NL
[1985/34]
Inventor(s)01 / Veldhoen, Jan Hendrik
Binnenweg 39
7391 GL Twello / NL
[1985/34]
Representative(s)Kupecz, Arpad, et al
Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V.
P.O. Box 20052
1000 HB Amsterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [1985/34]Kupecz, Arpad, et al
Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. Postbox 20052
NL-1000 HB Amsterdam / NL
Application number, filing date84201926.721.12.1984
[1985/34]
Priority number, dateNL1983000446829.12.1983         Original published format: NL 8304468
[1985/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0151830
Date:21.08.1985
Language:EN
[1985/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0151830
Date:27.07.1988
Language:EN
[1988/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.05.1985
ClassificationIPC:C04B28/06, C04B28/10, // (C04B28/06, 7:02, 14:42, 18:08, 22:06, 24:06, 32:02, 40:00, 40:02),(C04B28/10, 7:02, 7:32, 14:42, 18:08, 24:06, 32:02, 40:00, 40:02)
[1985/34]
CPC:
C04B28/10 (EP); Y02W30/91 (EP)
C-Set:
C04B28/10, C04B7/02, C04B7/32, C04B14/42, C04B18/08, C04B24/06, C04B40/00, C04B40/02 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1985/34]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum schnellen und kontrollierten Abbinden eines hydraulischen Bindemittels, das Portland- und Tonerdezement enthält, hydraulisches Bindemittel, sowie ein Herstellungsverfahren für Bauelemente[1988/30]
English:Process for the quick and controlled setting of a hydraulic binder containing both Portland cement and alumina cement, hydraulic binder, as well as a process for the manufacture of building elements[1988/30]
French:Procédé pour la prise rapide et contrôlée d'un liant hydraulique, contenant du ciment Portland et du ciment fondu, un liant hydraulique, et un procédé pour la fabrication des éléments de construction[1988/30]
Former [1985/34]Verfahren zum schnellen und kontrollierten Abbinden eines hydraulischen Bindemittels, das Portland- und Tonerdezement enthält, hydraulisches Bindemittel, eine Mischung eines hydraulischen Bindemittels mit Füllstoffen sowie ein Herstellungsverfahren für Bauelemente
Former [1985/34]Process for the quick and controlled setting of a hydraulic binder containing both Portland cement and alumina cement, hydraulic binder, mixture of a hydraulic binder and an aggregate, as well as a process for the manufacture of building elements
Former [1985/34]Procédé pour la prise rapide et contrôlée d'un liant hydraulique, contenant du ciment Portland et du ciment fondu, un liant hydraulique, un mélange d'un liant hydraulique et agrégat, et un procédé pour la fabrication des éléments de construction
Examination procedure19.08.1985Examination requested  [1985/45]
14.04.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.10.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
17.06.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.1987Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.01.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.04.1988Fee for grant paid
11.04.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.04.1989  02.05.1989  ADMISSIBLE
Gebr. Knauf Westdeutsche Gipswerke
Postfach 10
D-97343 Iphofen / DE
Opponent's representative
dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2010/16]
Opponent(s)01  11.04.1989  02.05.1989  ADMISSIBLE
Gebr. Knauf Westdeutsche Gipswerke
Postfach 10
D-97343 Iphofen / DE
Opponent's representative
von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2009/47]
Opponent(s)01  11.04.1989  02.05.1989  ADMISSIBLE
Gebr. Knauf Westdeutsche Gipswerke
Postfach 10
D-97343 Iphofen / DE
Opponent's representative
Werner, Hans-Karsten
Patentanwälte Von Kreisler Selting Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Former [1989/24]
Opponent(s)01  11.04.1989  02.05.1989  ADMISSIBLE
Gebr. Knauf Westdeutsche Gipswerke
Postfach 10
D-97343 Iphofen / DE
Opponent's representative
Werner, Hans-Karsten, Dr.
Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41
D-50462 Köln / DE
02.06.1989Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.12.1989Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.03.1990Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
13.07.1990Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
19.02.1991Date of oral proceedings
14.05.1991Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
14.05.1991Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
03.07.1991Reply to a communication from the opposition division
20.03.1992Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
30.03.1992Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
08.03.1993Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
18.03.1993Legal effect of revocation of patent [1993/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.07.1988
SE27.07.1988
[2015/21]
Former [1994/03]AT27.07.1988
CH27.07.1988
LI27.07.1988
SE27.07.1988
Former [1989/24]AT27.07.1988
SE27.07.1988
Former [1989/13]AT27.07.1988
Documents cited:Search[X]GB524227  (SHEPHERD S IND LTD, et al);
 [A]DE1198723  (DETLEF BREDTSCHNEIDER DR ING);
 [X]GB1313763  (CELMAC AG);
 [A]DE2006917  ;
 [A]DE2518799  (GUTFLEISCH PETER OSKAR DIPL IN)
Examination   - M. BALSEUICS "Entwicklung und Eigenschaften von Schnellzementen", Dissertation der TH. AAchen, 1980, Deckblatt und Seiten 1, 23, 93, 97-99, 111, 120. 125-128
    - Zement-Kalk-Gips Nr.5, 1975, Seiten 189, 202-203
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.