Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0149875


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.06.1989 No opposition filed within time limit published on  26.07.1989 [1989/30]
11.06.1988 (Expected) grant published on  27.07.1988 [1988/30]
09.12.1986 Change - representative published on  28.01.1987 [1987/05]
07.10.1986 First examination report
22.01.1986 Request for examination filed published on  12.03.1986 [1986/11]
31.05.1985 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  31.07.1985 [1985/31]