Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0149875

EP0149875 - Hydroisomerization of catalytically dewaxed lubricating oils [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.06.1989
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip08.06.1989No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.07.1989 [1989/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOBIL OIL CORPORATION
150 East 42nd Street New York
New York 10017 / US
[N/P]
Former [1985/31]For all designated states
MOBIL OIL CORPORATION
150 East 42nd Street
New York New York 10017 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Shu, Paul
21 Landing Lane
Princeton Junction New Jersey 08550 / US
02 / Yan, Tsoung-Yuan
2427 Fairmount Avenue
Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19130 / US
[1985/31]
Representative(s)Cooper, John Anthony , et al
Mobil Court 3 Clements Inn
London WC2A 2EB / GB
[1987/05]
Former [1985/31]West, Alan Harry
Mobil Court 3 Clements Inn
London WC2A 2EB / GB
Application number, filing date84300341.920.01.1984
[1985/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0149875
Date:31.07.1985
Language:EN
[1985/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0149875
Date:27.07.1988
Language:EN
[1988/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.10.1984
ClassificationInternational:C10G65/04
[1985/31]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1985/31]
TitleGerman:Hydroisomerisierung von katalytisch entwachsten Schmierölen[1985/31]
English:Hydroisomerization of catalytically dewaxed lubricating oils[1985/31]
French:Hydroisomérisation d'huiles lubrifiantes déparaffinées catalytiques[1985/31]
Examination procedure02.01.1986Examination requested  [1986/11]
06.10.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.02.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.1987Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.01.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.03.1988Fee for grant paid
19.03.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.04.1989No opposition filed within time limit [1989/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.01.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
28.12.1987Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US4292166  ;
 [X]EP0072220  ;
 [A]US3431194  ;
 [A]DE1795300  ;
 [A]US3487005