Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0119021

EP0119021 - Improved dental cleaning system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  20.08.1993
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dentsply Research and Development Corporation
Lakeview Avenue
Milford, Delaware 19963 / US
[1987/25]
Former [1985/15]For all designated states
Cooper Lasersonics Inc.
3420 Central Expressway
Santa Clara California 95051 / US
Former [1984/38]For all designated states
CAVITRON, INC.
11-40 Borden Avenue
Long Island New York 11101 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Warrin, George E.
914 Madison Place
North Merrick New York, 11566 / US
[1984/38]
Representative(s)Woodcraft, David Charles , et al
Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road
London EC1M 5SA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1984/38]Woodcraft, David Charles , et al
BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn
London, WC1V 6SE / GB
Application number, filing date84300954.914.02.1984
[1984/38]
Priority number, dateUS1983046781618.02.1983         Original published format: US 467816
[1984/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0119021
Date:19.09.1984
Language:EN
[1984/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0119021
Date:08.04.1987
Language:EN
[1987/15]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0119021
Date:06.10.1993
Language:EN
[1993/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.06.1984
ClassificationInternational:A61C17/02, B24C7/00
[1984/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1984/38]
TitleGerman:Zahnreinigungssystem[1984/38]
English:Improved dental cleaning system[1984/38]
French:Système de nettoyage des dents[1984/38]
Examination procedure31.08.1984Examination requested  [1984/46]
01.08.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.10.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
14.08.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.11.1986Fee for grant paid
13.11.1986Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.01.1988  01.02.1988  ADMISSIBLE
EMS S.A. Electro Medical Systems
G.-H. Piguet 17
CH-1347 Le Sentier / CH
Opponent's representative
Gauger, Hans-Peter
Müller, Schupfner & Gauger Postfach 10 11 61
D-80085 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1988/10]
Opponent(s)01  05.01.1988  01.02.1988  ADMISSIBLE
EMS S.A. Electro Medical Systems
G.-H. Piguet 17
CH-1347 Le Sentier / CH
Opponent's representative
Gauger, Hans-Peter, Dipl.-Ing.
Müller, Schupfner & Gauger Postfach 10 11 61
D-80085 München / DE
10.02.1988Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.07.1988Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.08.1988Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
08.12.1988Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
29.06.1989Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
23.04.1993Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
05.05.1993Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
05.07.1993Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition10.08.1989Appeal received No.  T0534/89
27.10.1989Statement of grounds filed
02.02.1993Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent inadmissible
02.02.1993Date of oral proceedings
11.02.1993Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLU29.02.1988
AT14.02.1989
GB14.02.1989
SE15.02.1989
BE28.02.1989
NL01.09.1989
[1999/52]
Former [1990/12]AT14.02.1989
GB14.02.1989
SE15.02.1989
BE28.02.1989
NL01.09.1989
Former [1990/09]AT14.02.1989
GB14.02.1989
SE15.02.1989
BE28.02.1989
Former [1990/04]GB14.02.1989
SE15.02.1989
BE28.02.1989
Former [1989/51]SE15.02.1989
BE28.02.1989
Former [1989/39]BE28.02.1989
Documents cited:SearchUS3882638  [ ] (BLACK ROBERT B);
 DE1948356  [ ] (COMCO SUPPLY INC);
 GB2042128  [ ] (REED INTERNATIONAL LTD);
 US3793785  [ ] (AUSTIN F);
 DE7313107U  [ ];
 EP0097288  [ ];
 DE2314294  [ ] (PENNWALT CORP);
 FR1066321  [ ] (RITTER CO INC)