Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0119021 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0119021



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 529
30.08.1993 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
26.08.1993 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
26.08.1993 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
05.07.1993 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
05.07.1993 Translation of the claims Opposition 6
05.07.1993 Translation of the claims Opposition 5
06.05.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.05.1993 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
05.05.1993 Text intended for grant Opposition 8
27.04.1993 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
23.04.1993 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
23.04.1993 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
17.03.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
11.02.1993 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
11.02.1993 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
02.02.1993 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
31.10.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
31.10.1992 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.10.1992 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
26.10.1992 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
26.10.1992 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
26.10.1992 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 3
26.10.1992 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
21.10.1992 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
16.10.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
15.10.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
09.10.1992 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
09.10.1992 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
12.03.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
02.03.1992 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
30.05.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.05.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
16.05.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.05.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
12.03.1990 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
12.03.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.03.1990 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
05.03.1990 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
10.11.1989 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
06.11.1989 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
27.10.1989 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 9
27.10.1989 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 13
27.10.1989 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.10.1989 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
27.10.1989 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
27.10.1989 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 38
27.10.1989 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
27.10.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 14
27.10.1989 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
27.10.1989 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
27.10.1989 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
13.10.1989 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
09.10.1989 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
10.08.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
10.08.1989 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
07.08.1989 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
24.07.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.07.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
29.06.1989 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
29.06.1989 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
29.06.1989 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 4
29.06.1989 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.06.1989 Means of redress Opposition 1
29.06.1989 Text intended for grant Opposition 8
28.06.1989 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
28.06.1989 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
28.06.1989 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
28.06.1989 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.06.1989 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.06.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.05.1989 Claims Opposition 7
30.05.1989 Description Opposition 9
30.05.1989 Drawings Opposition 2
30.05.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.05.1989 Translation of the claims Opposition 3
30.05.1989 Translation of the claims Opposition 2
11.04.1989 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
08.04.1989 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
08.04.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.04.1989 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
05.04.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.04.1989 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
31.03.1989 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
31.03.1989 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
31.03.1989 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.03.1989 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.1989 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
08.02.1989 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.02.1989 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.12.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.12.1988 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 3
03.08.1988 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
27.07.1988 Claims Opposition 6
27.07.1988 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 2
14.06.1988 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
07.06.1988 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
19.02.1988 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
10.02.1988 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
22.01.1988 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
05.01.1988 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
05.01.1988 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
05.01.1988 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
05.01.1988 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
05.01.1988 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.01.1988 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
29.04.1987 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.04.1987 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
31.03.1987 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 1
31.03.1987 Request for assignment Search / examination 1
26.03.1987 Request for assignment Search / examination 1
04.03.1987 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
13.11.1986 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
13.11.1986 Translation of the claims Search / examination 6
13.11.1986 Translation of the claims Search / examination 6
18.09.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 2
02.09.1986 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
10.08.1986 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
10.03.1986 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
10.03.1986 Text intended for grant Search / examination 30
10.02.1986 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
29.10.1985 Claims Search / examination 6
29.10.1985 Description Search / examination 8
29.10.1985 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.08.1985 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
01.02.1985 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
23.11.1984 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 2
23.11.1984 Request for assignment Search / examination 2
04.09.1984 Annex Search / examination 1
04.09.1984 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
04.09.1984 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 2
25.07.1984 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
28.06.1984 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
28.06.1984 European search report Search / examination 4
14.02.1984 Abstract Search / examination 2
14.02.1984 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 3
14.02.1984 Claims Search / examination 8
14.02.1984 Description Search / examination 19
14.02.1984 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.02.1984 Drawings Search / examination 2
14.02.1984 Priority document Search / examination 33
14.02.1984 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 12