Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0122042 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0122042



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1642
26.06.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
04.08.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
07.08.1997 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
07.08.1997 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
07.08.1997 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
07.08.1997 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
07.08.1997 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
06.08.1997 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
18.07.1997 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
18.07.1997 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
18.07.1997 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
09.07.1997 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 18
09.07.1997 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 2
09.07.1997 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
08.07.1997 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.06.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.06.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.06.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.06.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.06.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
05.06.1997 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
25.03.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.03.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.03.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
17.03.1997 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
17.03.1997 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
17.03.1997 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
14.03.1997 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
14.03.1997 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
14.03.1997 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
12.03.1997 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
11.03.1997 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.03.1997 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.03.1997 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.02.1997 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
28.02.1997 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
28.02.1997 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
05.02.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.02.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.01.1997 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
27.01.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
23.01.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
10.01.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.01.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.01.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.12.1996 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
20.12.1996 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 30
18.09.1996 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
29.07.1996 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
29.07.1996 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
29.07.1996 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
18.07.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.07.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.07.1996 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
09.07.1996 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
03.07.1996 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
03.07.1996 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
03.07.1996 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
20.06.1996 Claims Appeal 1
20.06.1996 Claims Appeal 1
20.06.1996 Claims Appeal 1
20.06.1996 Claims Appeal 1
20.06.1996 Claims Appeal 1
20.06.1996 Claims Appeal 1
20.06.1996 Claims Appeal 1
20.06.1996 Claims Appeal 1
20.06.1996 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 20
20.06.1996 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 2
22.05.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.05.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.05.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.05.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.05.1996 Claims Appeal 1
14.05.1996 Claims Appeal 1
14.05.1996 Claims Appeal 1
14.05.1996 Claims Appeal 1
14.05.1996 Claims Appeal 1
14.05.1996 Claims Appeal 1
14.05.1996 Claims Appeal 1
14.05.1996 Claims Appeal 1
14.05.1996 Claims Appeal 1
14.05.1996 Claims Appeal 1
14.05.1996 Claims Appeal 1
14.05.1996 Claims Appeal 1
14.05.1996 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
14.05.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
09.05.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
27.03.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
27.03.1996 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.03.1996 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.03.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
22.03.1996 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.03.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
20.03.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
20.03.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
18.03.1996 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.03.1996 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
17.03.1996 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
13.03.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
12.03.1996 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.03.1996 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.03.1996 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
05.03.1996 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
05.03.1996 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
27.02.1996 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 2
23.02.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.02.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.02.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
12.02.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.02.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.01.1996 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
30.01.1996 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
30.01.1996 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.01.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
26.01.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.01.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.01.1996 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 8
16.01.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
20.11.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.11.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.11.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.11.1995 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
16.11.1995 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
16.11.1995 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
16.11.1995 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
14.11.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
14.11.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
10.10.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
09.10.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
06.10.1995 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
06.10.1995 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
06.10.1995 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
05.10.1995 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
05.10.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.10.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.09.1995 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
18.09.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
18.09.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
18.09.1995 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.09.1995 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.09.1995 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.09.1995 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
08.09.1995 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
08.09.1995 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
08.09.1995 Oral proceedings: Annex to summons Appeal 2
05.09.1995 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
01.09.1995 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.08.1995 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.08.1995 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.08.1995 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.08.1995 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
18.08.1995 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
18.08.1995 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
08.10.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
22.09.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.09.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.09.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.09.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 14
14.09.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
01.09.1993 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
17.08.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.08.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.08.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 14
23.07.1993 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
23.07.1993 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
23.07.1993 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
19.07.1993 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
15.07.1993 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
15.03.1993 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
15.03.1993 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
04.03.1993 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 17
22.01.1993 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
22.01.1993 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
23.12.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.12.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
21.12.1992 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
17.12.1992 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
17.12.1992 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
30.11.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.11.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
30.11.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 36
30.11.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
30.11.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.11.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
30.11.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
30.11.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
30.11.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
30.11.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
30.11.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 17
30.11.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.11.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
30.11.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
30.11.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
30.11.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
30.11.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 29
30.11.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
30.11.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
30.11.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.11.1992 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
30.11.1992 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
07.11.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.11.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.11.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.11.1992 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 3
05.11.1992 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
05.11.1992 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
05.11.1992 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
05.11.1992 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 11
05.11.1992 Means of redress Opposition 1
05.11.1992 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
28.09.1992 Claims Opposition 1
28.09.1992 Claims Opposition 2
28.09.1992 Claims Opposition 2
28.09.1992 Claims Opposition 2
28.09.1992 Claims Opposition 2
28.09.1992 Description Opposition 1
28.09.1992 Description Opposition 1
28.09.1992 Description Opposition 1
28.09.1992 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
22.09.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
22.09.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
22.09.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
22.09.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.09.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.09.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
21.09.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
21.09.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
21.09.1992 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
17.09.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
17.09.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
14.09.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
11.09.1992 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
11.09.1992 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
10.09.1992 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
10.09.1992 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
10.09.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.09.1992 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
10.09.1992 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 18
07.09.1992 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
07.09.1992 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.1992 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
31.08.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.08.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.08.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.08.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.08.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.08.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
27.08.1992 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
27.08.1992 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
26.08.1992 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
26.08.1992 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
26.08.1992 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
25.08.1992 Claims Opposition 1
25.08.1992 Claims Opposition 1
25.08.1992 Description Opposition 2
25.08.1992 Description Opposition 2
25.08.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.08.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
25.08.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
25.08.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
25.08.1992 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 11
24.08.1992 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
23.07.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.07.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.07.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.07.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.07.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.07.1992 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.07.1992 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
08.07.1992 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
08.07.1992 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
29.06.1992 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
26.06.1992 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
16.06.1992 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.06.1992 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.06.1992 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.06.1992 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.05.1992 Withdrawal of an opposition Opposition 1
25.03.1992 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
24.03.1992 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
17.03.1992 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
16.03.1992 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
16.03.1992 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
16.03.1992 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
25.02.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
10.01.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
02.01.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
05.11.1991 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
05.11.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.11.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.11.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.11.1991 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
18.10.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
05.06.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.06.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.06.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.05.1991 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
24.05.1991 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 15
25.03.1991 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
05.03.1991 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
06.02.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
01.02.1991 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
08.01.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
08.01.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.12.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 10
07.12.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
07.12.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 10
07.12.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 9
07.12.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.12.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
07.12.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
07.12.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
07.12.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
07.12.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
29.11.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.11.1990 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
15.11.1990 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
15.11.1990 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
15.11.1990 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
27.09.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
20.09.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.09.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
14.09.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.09.1990 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
14.09.1990 N/A Opposition 1
14.09.1990 N/A Opposition 1
30.08.1990 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
30.08.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
14.08.1990 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
14.08.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.08.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
02.08.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
02.08.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
02.08.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
02.08.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
02.08.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
02.08.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
02.08.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
02.08.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 59
02.08.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
02.08.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
02.08.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.08.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
02.08.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
02.08.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
02.08.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
02.08.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.08.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
02.08.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
02.08.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.08.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.08.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.08.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
02.08.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
02.08.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
02.08.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 33
02.08.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
02.08.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
02.08.1990 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
02.08.1990 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
02.08.1990 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
02.08.1990 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
02.08.1990 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
01.08.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
13.11.1989 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
20.09.1989 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
30.06.1989 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
30.06.1989 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
30.06.1989 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
27.04.1989 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 13
11.04.1989 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
20.03.1989 Annex Search / examination 1
20.03.1989 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
21.11.1988 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
21.11.1988 Text intended for grant Search / examination 46
31.10.1988 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
01.08.1988 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
28.07.1988 Claims Search / examination 1
28.07.1988 Description Search / examination 4
28.07.1988 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.07.1988 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.07.1988 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.03.1988 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.12.1987 Claims Search / examination 1
08.12.1987 Description Search / examination 5
08.12.1987 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
22.10.1987 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
15.10.1987 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.06.1987 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
15.06.1987 Annex Search / examination 1
15.06.1987 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.05.1987 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
24.01.1986 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 1
24.01.1986 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 1
01.11.1985 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
01.11.1985 European search report Search / examination 2
22.08.1984 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
25.04.1984 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
25.04.1984 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
12.04.1984 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
12.04.1984 Priority document Search / examination 37
12.04.1984 Priority document Search / examination 33
12.04.1984 Priority document Search / examination 36
09.03.1984 Abstract Search / examination 1
09.03.1984 Claims Search / examination 3
09.03.1984 Description Search / examination 29
09.03.1984 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
09.03.1984 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.03.1984 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10