blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0124976

EP0124976 - Weighing apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.06.1989
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.1989No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.08.1989 [1989/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
K-TRON INTERNATIONAL, INC.
7975 N. Hayden Road Scottsdale
Arizona 85260 / US
[N/P]
Former [1984/46]For all designated states
K-TRON INTERNATIONAL, INC.
7975 N. Hayden Road
Scottsdale Arizona 85260 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bullivant, Kenneth W.
c/o K-Tron International, Inc. 7975 N. Hayden Road
Scottsdale Arizona 85260 / US
[1984/46]
Representative(s)Daley, Michael John, et al
F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40-43 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1JQ / GB
[1984/46]
Application number, filing date84301734.414.03.1984
[1984/46]
Priority number, dateUS1983049176505.05.1983         Original published format: US 491765
[1984/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0124976
Date:14.11.1984
Language:EN
[1984/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0124976
Date:24.08.1988
Language:EN
[1988/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.08.1984
ClassificationIPC:G01G19/42
[1984/46]
CPC:
G01G19/42 (EP,US); G07D9/04 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1984/46]
TitleGerman:Einrichtung und Verfahren zum Wägen[1984/46]
English:Weighing apparatus and method[1984/46]
French:Dispositif et procédé pour peser[1984/46]
Examination procedure22.03.1985Examination requested  [1985/24]
11.08.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.12.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.07.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.11.1987Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.02.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.02.1988Fee for grant paid
29.02.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.05.1989No opposition filed within time limit [1989/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
18.03.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
11.03.1988Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US4157738  (FUJIOKA UTARO [JP], et al);
 [A]GB2027914  (AVERY LTD W & T);
 [A]GB2076979  (PERKAM LTD)
ExaminationFR2340539
 FR2391274
    - Wägen + dosieren, Mainz (DE) 5/1982 p. 178 to 180, 1/1983 pages 24 and 25, E. Debler: "Zählwaagen-Einflu~grö~en und Fehlerfortpflanzung bei der Ermittlung der Stückzahl"
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.