Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0122791 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0122791



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2980
13.01.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
13.01.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
21.02.1997 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
20.02.1997 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
20.02.1997 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
20.02.1997 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
20.02.1997 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
20.02.1997 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
20.02.1997 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
20.02.1997 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
20.02.1997 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
20.02.1997 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
20.02.1997 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
20.02.1997 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
20.02.1997 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
28.01.1997 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
28.01.1997 Translation of the claims Opposition 1
28.01.1997 Translation of the claims Opposition 1
27.01.1997 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 3
23.10.1996 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
23.10.1996 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
23.10.1996 Text intended for grant Opposition 70
17.10.1996 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
24.09.1996 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
21.05.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
20.05.1996 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
20.05.1996 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
20.05.1996 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
20.05.1996 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
20.05.1996 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
20.05.1996 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
20.05.1996 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
20.05.1996 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
20.05.1996 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
20.05.1996 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
20.05.1996 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
09.05.1996 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.05.1996 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.05.1996 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 41
07.05.1996 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 7
07.05.1996 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 8
06.05.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
03.05.1996 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
03.05.1996 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.05.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
23.04.1996 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
20.04.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
10.04.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
04.04.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.04.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.04.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.04.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.04.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.04.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.04.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.04.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.04.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.04.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.04.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
29.03.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
22.03.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
24.02.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
24.02.1996 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.02.1996 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.02.1996 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.02.1996 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.02.1996 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.02.1996 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.02.1996 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
21.02.1996 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
15.02.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
15.02.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
15.02.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
15.02.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
15.02.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
15.02.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
15.02.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
15.02.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
15.02.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
15.02.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
15.02.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
15.02.1996 Oral proceedings: Annex to summons Appeal 6
13.02.1996 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
30.01.1996 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
26.01.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
25.01.1996 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
25.01.1996 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
25.01.1996 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
25.01.1996 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
25.01.1996 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
25.01.1996 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
25.01.1996 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
25.01.1996 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
25.01.1996 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
08.12.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
08.12.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
08.12.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
08.12.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
08.12.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
08.12.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
08.12.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
08.12.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
08.12.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
08.12.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
08.12.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
08.12.1994 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
23.11.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
17.11.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
10.11.1994 Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them Appeal 2
05.11.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
05.10.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
03.10.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
21.06.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
13.05.1994 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
06.04.1994 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
04.03.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
04.03.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
18.10.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.10.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.10.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.10.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.10.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.10.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.10.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.10.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.10.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.10.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.10.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
14.07.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.07.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.07.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.07.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.07.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.07.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.07.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.07.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.07.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.07.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.07.1993 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
12.07.1993 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
12.07.1993 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
12.07.1993 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
12.07.1993 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
12.07.1993 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
12.07.1993 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
12.07.1993 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
07.07.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 18
27.04.1993 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
27.04.1993 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
27.04.1993 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
27.04.1993 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
27.04.1993 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
27.04.1993 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
27.04.1993 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
27.04.1993 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
27.04.1993 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
27.04.1993 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
27.04.1993 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
20.04.1993 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
12.03.1993 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
12.03.1993 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
12.03.1993 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
12.03.1993 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
12.03.1993 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
12.03.1993 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
12.03.1993 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
12.03.1993 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
12.03.1993 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
12.03.1993 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
12.03.1993 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
01.03.1993 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
23.11.1992 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
23.11.1992 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
20.11.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
28.10.1992 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.10.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
15.10.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
15.10.1992 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 15
15.10.1992 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 90
14.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.10.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
14.10.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 40
14.10.1992 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
14.10.1992 Withdrawal of an appeal Appeal 1
12.10.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.10.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.10.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.10.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
12.10.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
12.10.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
12.10.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
12.10.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
03.10.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
03.10.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
03.10.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.10.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
03.10.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
03.10.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
03.10.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
03.10.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
03.10.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
03.10.1992 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 32
03.10.1992 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
03.10.1992 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
03.10.1992 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
02.10.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
05.09.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
05.09.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
05.09.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
05.09.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
03.09.1992 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
28.08.1992 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.08.1992 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.08.1992 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.08.1992 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.08.1992 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.08.1992 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.08.1992 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
28.08.1992 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
28.08.1992 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
28.08.1992 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
28.08.1992 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
28.08.1992 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
28.08.1992 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
28.08.1992 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
28.08.1992 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
28.08.1992 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
13.08.1992 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
12.08.1992 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
03.08.1992 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
27.07.1992 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
21.07.1992 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
20.07.1992 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
07.07.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
27.06.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.06.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.06.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.06.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
16.06.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
13.06.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
13.06.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
13.06.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
13.06.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.06.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.06.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.06.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.06.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.06.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
09.06.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.06.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
05.06.1992 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
05.06.1992 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
05.06.1992 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
05.06.1992 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
05.06.1992 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
05.06.1992 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
05.06.1992 Annex to the communication Opposition 16
05.06.1992 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
05.06.1992 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 34
05.06.1992 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.1992 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.1992 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.1992 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.1992 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.1992 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.1992 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.1992 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.1992 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.1992 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.1992 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.1992 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
05.06.1992 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.1992 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.1992 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.1992 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.1992 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.1992 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.1992 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.1992 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.1992 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.1992 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.1992 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.03.1992 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
19.03.1992 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
19.03.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
19.03.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.03.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.03.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.03.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.03.1992 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
27.02.1992 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.02.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.02.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
18.02.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.02.1992 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
24.01.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
24.01.1992 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
16.01.1992 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.01.1992 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 7
29.12.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.10.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
07.10.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
20.09.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.09.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
16.09.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.09.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.09.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
13.09.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
13.09.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.09.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
10.09.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
10.09.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.09.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
07.09.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.09.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
06.09.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
06.09.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
05.09.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
05.09.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.09.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
02.09.1991 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
02.09.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
02.09.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
02.09.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
02.09.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
02.09.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
02.09.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
02.09.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
02.09.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
02.09.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
02.09.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
02.09.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
20.08.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
20.08.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
19.08.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
13.08.1991 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
13.08.1991 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
13.08.1991 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
13.08.1991 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
13.08.1991 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.08.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.08.1991 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.02.1991 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.02.1991 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 30
07.02.1991 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 30
02.02.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.12.1990 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
30.11.1990 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
28.11.1990 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.11.1990 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.11.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
08.11.1990 Drawings Opposition 2
08.11.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.11.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.10.1990 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
26.09.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.09.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.09.1990 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
19.09.1990 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.09.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.09.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.09.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.07.1990 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.06.1990 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
01.06.1990 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
01.06.1990 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
25.05.1990 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
25.05.1990 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
25.05.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
25.05.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
25.05.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
25.05.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 3
25.05.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
25.05.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
30.04.1990 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.04.1990 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.04.1990 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.04.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
17.04.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.04.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
17.04.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
17.04.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
17.04.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
17.04.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
12.04.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
11.04.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
11.04.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
11.04.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
11.04.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
11.04.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 12
11.04.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
11.04.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 12
11.04.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
11.04.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
11.04.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
11.04.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
11.04.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
11.04.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
11.04.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
11.04.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.04.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
11.04.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.04.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.04.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.04.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.04.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.04.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
06.04.1990 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.03.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 8
13.03.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.03.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.03.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
09.03.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.03.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.03.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
08.03.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
07.03.1990 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
07.03.1990 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 2
03.03.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
03.03.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.02.1990 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.02.1990 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.02.1990 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.02.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
23.02.1990 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.02.1990 Request for documents Opposition 1
23.02.1990 Request for documents Opposition 1
21.02.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
20.02.1990 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
20.02.1990 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
16.02.1990 Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied Opposition 1
16.02.1990 Noting of loss of rights (opposition deemed not to have been filed) Opposition 1
16.02.1990 Request for documents Opposition 1
16.02.1990 Request for documents Opposition 1
15.02.1990 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
15.02.1990 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
15.02.1990 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
15.02.1990 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
15.02.1990 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.02.1990 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.02.1990 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.02.1990 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.02.1990 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.01.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.01.1990 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
23.01.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.01.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.01.1990 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.01.1990 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.01.1990 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.01.1990 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.01.1990 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.01.1990 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.01.1990 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.01.1990 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.01.1990 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.01.1990 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.01.1990 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
30.12.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.12.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
30.12.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
29.12.1989 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
29.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
29.12.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
29.12.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
29.12.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 22
29.12.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
28.12.1989 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
28.12.1989 General authorisation Opposition 1
28.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
28.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
28.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
28.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
28.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
28.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
28.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
28.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
28.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
28.12.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
28.12.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
27.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
27.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
27.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
27.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
27.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
27.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
27.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
27.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
27.12.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
27.12.1989 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 88
27.12.1989 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 96
23.12.1989 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
23.12.1989 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
23.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
23.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
23.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
23.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
23.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
23.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
23.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
23.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
23.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
23.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
23.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
23.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
23.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
23.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
23.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
23.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
23.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
23.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
23.12.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
23.12.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 19
23.12.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
23.12.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
23.12.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
23.12.1989 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 67
23.12.1989 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 92
23.12.1989 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 113
23.12.1989 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 80
23.12.1989 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 162
22.12.1989 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
22.12.1989 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
22.12.1989 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
22.12.1989 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
22.12.1989 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
22.12.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
22.12.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
21.12.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.12.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 12
04.04.1989 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
16.02.1989 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
14.11.1988 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
14.11.1988 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
14.11.1988 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
28.10.1988 Communication about missing advice of delivery Search / examination 1
28.10.1988 Description Search / examination 3
23.09.1988 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
23.09.1988 Drawings Search / examination 5
23.09.1988 Drawings Search / examination 5
16.08.1988 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 19
30.07.1988 Description Search / examination 2
30.07.1988 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
21.04.1988 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
21.04.1988 Text intended for grant Search / examination 90
16.04.1988 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
07.01.1988 Annex Search / examination 56
07.01.1988 Claims Search / examination 2
07.01.1988 Description Search / examination 2
07.01.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
07.01.1988 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
01.09.1987 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
08.08.1986 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
10.05.1986 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
10.05.1986 General authorisation Search / examination 1
01.11.1984 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
29.08.1984 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
13.08.1984 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.08.1984 European search report Search / examination 3
29.06.1984 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
14.06.1984 Invitation to file authorisation Search / examination 2
28.05.1984 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
28.05.1984 Priority document Search / examination 90
24.04.1984 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.04.1984 Abstract Search / examination 1
13.04.1984 Claims Search / examination 2
13.04.1984 Description Search / examination 45
13.04.1984 Drawings Search / examination 19
13.04.1984 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
13.04.1984 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
13.04.1984 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
13.04.1984 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
04.04.1984 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1