blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0125086

EP0125086 - Imageable vapor-deposited colorant layers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.07.1989
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [1984/46]For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Fisch, Richard S. Minnesota Mining and Man. Co.
2501 Hudson Road P.O. Box 33427
St, Paul Minnesota 55133 / US
02 / Barjesteh, Hamid Minnesota Mining and Man. Co.
2501 Hudson Road P.O. Box 33427
St, Paul Minnesota 55133 / US
[1984/46]
Representative(s)Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al
Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1984/46]Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al
c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2
D-80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date84302899.430.04.1984
[1984/46]
Priority number, dateUS1983049047902.05.1983         Original published format: US 490479
[1984/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0125086
Date:14.11.1984
Language:EN
[1984/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0125086
Date:10.07.1985
Language:EN
[1985/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.05.1985
ClassificationIPC:G03F1/00
[1984/46]
CPC:
G03F1/56 (EP); G03C1/00 (KR)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1984/46]
TitleGerman:Bildfähige im Vakuum abgesetzte Farbschichten[1984/46]
English:Imageable vapor-deposited colorant layers[1984/46]
French:Couches avec des colorants déposés sous vide pouvant être pourvues avec des images[1984/46]
File destroyed:14.07.1995
Examination procedure09.12.1985Examination requested  [1986/08]
05.02.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.07.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.08.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.01.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.10.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.1989Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1989/34]
14.03.1989Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [1989/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.1988Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
02.05.198906   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US4271256  (KIDO KEISHIRO, et al);
 [X]DE2708264  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD);
 [X]US4268541  (IKEDA TOMOAKI, et al);
 [A]DE1614863  (TELEFUNKEN PATENT)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.