Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0160755

EP0160755 - Vacuum package with smooth appearance [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.05.1989
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.05.1990Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SE
published on 27.06.1990 [1990/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CRESCENT HOLDING N.V.
Pietermaj 168A Willemstad
Curaçao / AN
[N/P]
Former [1985/46]For all designated states
CRESCENT HOLDING N.V.
Pietermaj 168A
Willemstad, Curaçao / AN
Inventor(s)01 / Van Boxtel, I.M. Gerardus
Kleine Krogt 3
NL-4825 AN Breda / NL
[1985/46]
Representative(s)Shaw, Laurence
5th Floor, Metropolitan House, 1 Hagley Road, Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8TG / GB
[1985/46]
Application number, filing date84302987.703.05.1984
[1985/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0160755
Date:13.11.1985
Language:EN
[1985/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0160755
Date:27.07.1988
Language:EN
[1988/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.1985
ClassificationInternational:B65D81/20, B65D30/08
[1985/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1985/46]
TitleGerman:Vakuumverpackung mit glatter Aussicht[1985/46]
English:Vacuum package with smooth appearance[1985/46]
French:Emballage sous vide présentant un aspect lisse[1985/46]
Examination procedure13.05.1986Examination requested  [1986/30]
30.10.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.01.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.05.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.1987Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.01.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.04.1988Fee for grant paid
22.04.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.04.1989No opposition filed within time limit [1989/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
29.04.1988Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.07.1988
SE27.07.1988
[1989/24]
Former [1989/13]AT27.07.1988
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2085401  ;
 [X]FR2022831  ;
 [A]US3447428  ;
 [A]GB1357475