blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0127429

EP0127429 - Process for preparing optically active ((3-amino-3-carboxy)propyl-1) phosphinic acid derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.02.1990
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip19.02.1990No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.04.1990 [1990/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Meiji Seika Kaisha Ltd.
4-16, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8002 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1984/49]For all designated states
MEIJI SEIKA KAISHA LTD.
4-16 Kyobashi 2-chome
Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Minowa, Nobuto
3-13, Suwazaka Tsurumi-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP
02 / Fukatsu, Shunzo
1-13, Ichigaya-tamachi Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
03 / Tachibana, Kunitaka
4-11-35, Minami-azabu Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
04 / Niida, Taro
127, Naka-kibogaoka Asahi-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP
05 / Mase, Sadaaki
2-5-17, Kasuya Setagaya-ku
Tokyo / JP
[1989/16]
Former [1984/49]01 / Minowa, Nobuto
3-13, Suwazaka Tsurumi-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP
02 / Fukatsu, Shunzo
1-13, Ichigaya-tamachi Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
03 / Tachibana, Kunitaka
4-11-35, Minami-azabu Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
04 / Niida, Taro
127, Naka-kibogoaka Asahi-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP
05 / Mase, Sadaaki
2-5-17, Kasuya Setagaya-ku
Tokyo / JP
Representative(s)Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert, et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street
London W1G 8ER / GB
[N/P]
Former [1988/16]Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert, et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street
London W1M 8AH / GB
Former [1984/49]Brock, Peter William
Michael Burnside & Partners 2 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street
London EC4Y 1HL / GB
Application number, filing date84303475.222.05.1984
[1984/49]
Priority number, dateJP1983009244827.05.1983         Original published format: JP 9244883
[1984/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0127429
Date:05.12.1984
Language:EN
[1984/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0127429
Date:14.08.1985
Language:EN
[1985/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0127429
Date:19.04.1989
Language:EN
[1989/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.06.1985
ClassificationIPC:C07F9/30, // A01N57/20
[1984/49]
CPC:
A01N57/22 (EP,US); A01N57/20 (EP,US); C07F9/301 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1984/49]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von optisch aktiven ((3-Amino-3-carboxy)propyl-1)phosphinsäure-Derivaten[1984/49]
English:Process for preparing optically active ((3-amino-3-carboxy)propyl-1) phosphinic acid derivatives[1984/49]
French:Procédé de préparation de dérivés optiquement actifs d'acide((amino-3-carboxy-3)-propyl-1)phosphinique[1984/49]
Examination procedure15.01.1986Examination requested  [1986/12]
27.10.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.02.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.10.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.12.1988Fee for grant paid
27.12.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.01.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1990/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.05.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
22.05.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
11.05.1988Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]  - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, vol. 24, no. 23, 1983, pages 2391-2392, Pergamon Press Ltd., GB; N. MINOWA et al.: "A practical synthesis of (+/-)-phosphinothricine"
 [XP]  - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, vol. 25, no. 11, 1984, pages 1147-1150, Pergamon Press Ltd., GB; N. MINOWA et al.: "Asymmetric synthesis of (+)-phosphinothricin and (+)-2-amino-4-phosphonobutyric acid"
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.