Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0129422

EP0129422 - Weighing device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.01.1987
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Skeen, June Caroline
100 Queen Victoria Street Bexley
New South Wales 2207 / AU
For all designated states
Prgomet, Leon Stephen
100 Queen Victoria Street Bexley
New South Wales 2207 / AU
[N/P]
Former [1984/52]For all designated states
Skeen, June Caroline
100 Queen Victoria Street
Bexley New South Wales 2207 / AU
For all designated states
Prgomet, Leon Stephen
100 Queen Victoria Street
Bexley New South Wales 2207 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / Prgomet, Leon Stephen
100 Queen Victoria Street
New South Wales 2207 / AU
[1984/52]
Representative(s)JENSEN & SON
366-368 Old Street
London EC1V 9LT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1984/52]JENSEN & SON
70 Paul Street
London EC2A 4NA / GB
Application number, filing date84304047.815.06.1984
[1984/52]
Priority number, dateAU1983000986517.06.1983         Original published format: AU 986583
[1984/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0129422
Date:27.12.1984
Language:EN
[1984/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0129422
Date:08.01.1986
Language:EN
[1986/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.11.1985
ClassificationInternational:G01G5/00, G01G19/16, G01G21/00
[1984/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1984/52]
TitleGerman:Wiegeapparat[1984/52]
English:Weighing device[1984/52]
French:Dispositif de pesage[1984/52]
File destroyed:27.05.1993
Examination procedure09.09.1986Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1987/11]
08.10.1986Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1987/11]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
08.07.1986M02   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.198603   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4044610  ;
 [Y]DE3020323  ;
 [Y]DE3220143  ;
 [A]FR2401407  ;
 [A]US3819922  ;
 [A]FR2443419  ;
 [A]DE2940445  ;
 [A]FR1578517