blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0132081

EP0132081 - Semiconductor laser device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.1988
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.12.1988Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 01.02.1989 [1989/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1985/04]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Motegi, Nawoto c/o Patent Divison
Toshiba Corporation Principal Office 1-1, Shibaura
1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP
02 / Okajima, Masaki c/o Patent Divison
Toshiba Corporation Principal Office 1-1, Shibaura
1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP
03 / Muto, Yuhei c/o Patent Divison
Toshiba Corporation Principal Office 1-1, Shibaura
1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP
[1985/04]
Representative(s)Kirk, Geoffrey Thomas, et al
BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 102-108 Clerkenwell Road
London EC1M 5SA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1985/04]Kirk, Geoffrey Thomas, et al
BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road
London EC1R 0DS / GB
Application number, filing date84304546.903.07.1984
[1985/04]
Priority number, dateJP1983012137104.07.1983         Original published format: JP 12137183
[1985/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0132081
Date:23.01.1985
Language:EN
[1985/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0132081
Date:10.04.1985
Language:EN
[1985/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0132081
Date:09.09.1987
Language:EN
[1987/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.02.1985
ClassificationIPC:H01S3/19, H01L33/00
[1985/04]
CPC:
H01S5/2231 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1985/04]
TitleGerman:Halbleiterlaser[1985/04]
English:Semiconductor laser device[1985/04]
French:Laser à semi-conducteur[1985/04]
Examination procedure02.08.1985Examination requested  [1985/43]
30.07.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
25.09.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.11.1986Fee for grant paid
28.11.1986Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.06.1988No opposition filed within time limit [1988/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
07.07.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL09.09.1987
[1989/05]
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0042585  (HITACHI LTD [JP]);
 [Y]GB2105099  (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD [GB])
 [Y]  - OPTICS COMMUNICATIONS vol. 40, no. 3, January 1982, Amsterdam, NL; S.R: CHINN et al. "TE modes of gruded-index large -optical-cavity waveguides", pages 179-184
 [A]  - IEEE JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS vol. QE-19, no. 7, July 1983, New York, USA; S. TURLEY "Optical waveguiding in (In, Ga)(As, P) inverted rib waveguide lasers at 1,3 mum wavelength", pages 1186-1195
 [AD]  - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS vol. 37, no. 3, August 1980, New York, USA; J.J. COLEMAN et al "Single-longitudinal-mode metalorganic chemical-vapor-deposition self-aligned GaAl As-GaAs double-heterostructure lasers", pages 262-263
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.