blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0134088


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
17.04.2015 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  20.05.2015  [2015/21]
30.05.1990 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.07.1990 [1990/29]
15.05.1990 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.1990 [1990/27]
12.05.1990 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.1990 [1990/26]
19.01.1990 No opposition filed within time limit published on  07.03.1990 [1990/10]
14.01.1989 (Expected) grant published on  01.03.1989 [1989/09]
22.08.1986 First examination report
11.09.1985 Request for examination filed published on  13.11.1985 [1985/46]
12.01.1985 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  13.03.1985 [1985/11]