blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0134088
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0134088Global Dossier 01.03.1989B1
EP0134088 13.03.1985A1
Priority number Date
GB8318313 06.07.1983
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA1253825 09.05.1989A
Priority number Date
GB8318313 06.07.1983
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE3476893D 06.04.1989D1
Priority number Date
GB8318313 06.07.1983
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB8318313D 10.08.1983D0
Priority number Date
GB8318313 06.07.1983
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US4781819 01.11.1988A
Priority number Date
GB8318313 06.07.1983
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US4915819 10.04.1990A
Priority number Date
GB8318313 06.07.1983