blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0134088

Designated contracting states BE 
 DE 
FR 
GB 
 IT 
 NL 
Examination procedure21.09.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
14.06.1988Renewal fee patent year 05
European patent granted01.03.1989
Opposition procedure02.12.1989No opposition filed within time limit published on 07.03.1990 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:13.03.1985 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Designated State(s):BE DE FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:13.11.1985 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19850830
 
Event date:08.10.1986 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19860822
 
Event date:01.03.1989 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):BE DE FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:21.03.1989 
Event description:IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED
Owner Name:ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.
 
Event date:06.04.1989 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:3476893
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:19890406
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:07.04.1989 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:07.03.1990 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
 
Event date:31.07.1991 
Event description:IT: LAST PAID ANNUAL FEE
 
Event date:10.06.1994 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:19940610
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:27.06.1994 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:19940627
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.07.1994 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:19940731
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:04.08.1994 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:19940804
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:25.08.1994 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:19940825
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:05.07.1995 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Effective DATE:19950705
 
Event date:31.07.1995 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Effective DATE:19950731
 
Event date:31.01.1996 
Event description:BE: LAPSED
Owner Name:THE BRITISH PETROLEUM CY P.L.C.
Effective DATE:19950731
 
Event date:31.01.1996 
Event description:BE: LAPSED
Owner Name:S.A. INTEVEP
Effective DATE:19950731
 
Event date:01.02.1996 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Effective DATE:19960201
 
Event date:06.03.1996 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:19950705
 
Event date:01.04.1996 
Event description:NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
Effective DATE:19960201
 
Event date:02.04.1996 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Effective DATE:19960402
 
Event date:30.04.1996 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Effective DATE:19960430
 
Event date:03.05.1996 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
 
Event date:15.05.1996 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
 
Event date:14.06.1996 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE