Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0134088

EP0134088 - Treatment of viscous crude oil [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.1990
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting statepublished on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The British Petroleum Company p.l.c.
Britannic House Moor Lane
London EC2Y 9BU / GB
For all designated states
Intevep SA
Apartado 76343
Caracas 1070 A / VE
[N/P]
Former [1985/11]For all designated states
The British Petroleum Company p.l.c.
Britannic House Moor Lane
London EC2Y 9BU / GB
For all designated states
Intevep SA
Apartado 76343
Caracas 1070 A / VE
Inventor(s)01 / Chirinos, Maria Luisa
Intevep, SA Apartado 76343
Caracas, Venezuela / VE
02 / Grosso, Jorge Luis
Intevep SA Apartado 76343
Caracas / VE
03 / Layrisse, Ignacio
Intevep SA Aparatado 76343
Caracas / VE
04 / Stockwell, Alan The British Petroleum Co. p.l.c.
Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames
Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB
[1985/11]
Representative(s)MacLeod, Malcolm , et al
c/o The British Petroleum Company plc Patents Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames
Middlesex, TW16 7LN / GB
[N/P]
Former [1985/11]MacLeod, Malcolm , et al
c/o The British Petroleum Company plc Patents Division Chertsey Road
Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex, TW16 7LN / GB
Application number, filing date84304625.105.07.1984
[1985/11]
Priority number, dateGB1983001831306.07.1983         Original published format: GB 8318313
[1985/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0134088
Date:13.03.1985
Language:EN
[1985/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0134088
Date:01.03.1989
Language:EN
[1989/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.11.1984
ClassificationInternational:C10G21/14, F17D1/16
[1985/11]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1985/11]
TitleGerman:Behandlung von viskosen Rohölen[1985/11]
English:Treatment of viscous crude oil[1985/11]
French:Traitement de pétroles bruts visqueux[1985/11]
Examination procedure30.08.1985Examination requested  [1985/46]
22.08.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.12.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
21.11.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.08.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.09.1988Fee for grant paid
21.09.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.12.1989No opposition filed within time limit [1990/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
14.06.1988Renewal fee patent year 05
Former [1990/26]BE31.07.1989
Documents cited:SearchGB1175028  [ ] (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]);
 GB2001670  [ ] (BOTT T, et al);
 US3434967  [ ] (OLDENBURG CHARLES C);
 US4391701  [ ] (LE PAGE JEAN-FRANCOIS [FR], et al)