blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0133796

EP0133796 - Process for preparation of methionine hydroxy analog or derivative and esters thereof, and for the preparation of 1-acyloxy-3-hydrocarbyl thiopropenes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1985/10]Process for preparation of methionine hydroxy analog or derivative and esters thereof, and for the preparation of 1-acyloxy-3-hydrocarbyl thiopropenes and products resulting from such synthesis
[1987/10]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.01.1988
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.05.1991Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 03.07.1991 [1991/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE STANDARD OIL COMPANY
Midland Building
Cleveland, Ohio 44115 / US
[1985/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Burrington, James David
23860 Harms Road
Richmond Hts., OH 44143 / US
02 / Cesa, Mark Clark
4617 Birchwold Road
South Euclid, OH 44121 / US
[1987/10]
Former [1985/10]01 / Burrington, James David
23860 Harms Road Richmond Hts.
Ohio 44143 / US
02 / Cesa, Mark Clark
4617 Birchwold Road South Euclid
Ohio 44121 / US
Representative(s)Smith, Sydney, et al
Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [1985/10]Smith, Sydney, et al
Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date84305228.301.08.1984
[1985/10]
Priority number, dateUS1983052004203.08.1983         Original published format: US 520042
[1985/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0133796
Date:06.03.1985
Language:EN
[1985/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0133796
Date:04.03.1987
Language:EN
[1987/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.01.1985
ClassificationIPC:C07C149/20
[1985/10]
CPC:
C07C323/00 (EP,US); C07C323/50 (KR); C07C327/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1985/10]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung des Hydroxyanalogons des Methionins oder von Derivaten und Estern davon, und zur Herstellung von 1-Acyloxy-3-hydrocarbylthiopropenen[1987/10]
English:Process for preparation of methionine hydroxy analog or derivative and esters thereof, and for the preparation of 1-acyloxy-3-hydrocarbyl thiopropenes[1987/10]
French:Procédé pour la préparation de l'analogue hydroxy de la méthionine ou de ses dérivés ou de ses esters, et procédé pour la préparation d'acyloxy-1-hydrocarbylthio-3 propènes[1987/10]
Former [1985/10]Verfahren zur Herstellung des Hydroxyanalogons des Methionins oder von Derivaten und Estern davon, und zur Herstellung von 1-Acyloxy-3-hydrocarbylthiopropenen sowie die sich aus dieser Synthese ergebenden Produkte
Former [1985/10]Process for preparation of methionine hydroxy analog or derivative and esters thereof, and for the preparation of 1-acyloxy-3-hydrocarbyl thiopropenes and products resulting from such synthesis
Former [1985/10]Procédé pour la préparation de l'analogue hydroxy de la méthionine ou de ses dérivés ou de ses esters, et procédé pour la préparation d'acyloxy-1-hydrocarbylthio-3 propènes et produits obtenus par cette synthèse
Examination procedure08.08.1985Examination requested  [1985/43]
06.12.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.03.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
12.08.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.10.1986Fee for grant paid
14.10.1986Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.12.1987No opposition filed within time limit [1988/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.07.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchUS2745745  [ ] (BLAKE EDWARD S, et al);
 DE1157216  [ ] (STAMICARBON);
 US3773927  [ ] (CUMMINS E);
 DE2945497  [ ] (DEGUSSA)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.