blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0136833
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0136833Global Dossier 19.02.1986A3
EP0136833 10.04.1985A2
Priority number Date
AU120583 02.09.1983
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JPS6073562 25.04.1985A
Priority number Date
AU120583 02.09.1983